EP3395140 - AUTONOMOUS TRACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Longo, Luigi Via delle medaglie d'Oro, 16 87100 Cosenza / IT | For all designated states Quintieri, Fausto Via Domenico Frugiuele, 66 87100 Cosenza / IT | For all designated states Abbati, Enrico Piazza Solferino, 5 10121 Torino / IT | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Tagliafico, Giulia Litapat Via Simone Martini, 125 00142 Roma / IT | [2018/44] | Application number, filing date | 18162768.8 | 20.03.2018 | [2018/44] | Priority number, date | IT20170031156 | 21.03.2017 Original published format: IT201700031156 | [2018/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3395140 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01B69/04, B62D55/07, G05D1/02 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
A01B69/008 (EP);
B60K35/28 (EP);
G05D1/024 (EP);
B60K2360/175 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] |
Former [2018/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTONOMER TRAKTOR | [2018/44] | English: | AUTONOMOUS TRACTOR | [2018/44] | French: | TRACTEUR AUTONOME | [2018/44] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/24] | 30.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2055336 (POCLAIN SA) [A] 1-8* abstract *; | [A]CN201053119Y (HONGXIANG WANG [CN]) [A] 1-8 * figure 1, *; | [A]CN201280521Y (JIANGYIN LIANYE BIOLOG TECHNOL [CN]) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2009141465 (OTRI UNIVERSIDAD DE ALMERIA [ES], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract *; | [Y]EP2858471 (COUCHMAN JOHNNY [IE]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0038] *; | [A]US2016174454 (PHAN AUSTIN H [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,2 * |