EP3388793 - ELECTRONIC ASSEMBLY FOR PERIPHERAL DEVICES OF AN AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr-Aerospace Lindenberg GmbH Pfänderstrasse 50-52 88161 Lindenberg/Allgäu / DE | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fink, Cornelius Hälin 248 6932 Langen / AT | 02 /
Immler, Thomas Kammbachstr. 22 b 88138 Sigmarszell / DE | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2018/42] | Application number, filing date | 18162788.6 | 20.03.2018 | [2018/42] | Priority number, date | DE20171003660 | 13.04.2017 Original published format: DE102017003660 | [2018/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3388793 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3388793 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01D21/00, G06F13/40, H03K19/0175, G05B19/042 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
H03K19/017509 (EP,US);
B64C13/00 (CN);
B64C13/02 (RU);
B64D43/00 (RU,US);
G01D21/00 (EP,US);
G05B19/0423 (EP,US);
G06F13/4072 (EP,US);
G06F30/34 (US);
G08C19/00 (CN);
G08C19/02 (CN);
G08C19/12 (CN);
G08C19/16 (CN);
G01D5/2291 (US);
G01R19/25 (US);
G05B2219/45071 (EP,US);
G06F30/39 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/42] | G01D21/00, B64D43/00, G05B19/042 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE BAUGRUPPE FÜR PERIPHERIEGERÄTE EINES FLUGGERÄTS | [2018/42] | English: | ELECTRONIC ASSEMBLY FOR PERIPHERAL DEVICES OF AN AIRCRAFT | [2018/42] | French: | MODULE ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR APPAREILS PÉRIPHÉRIQUES D'UN AÉRONEF | [2018/42] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 17.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.03.2022 | 03.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.06.2022 | CZ | 22.06.2022 | DK | 22.06.2022 | EE | 22.06.2022 | ES | 22.06.2022 | FI | 22.06.2022 | HR | 22.06.2022 | IT | 22.06.2022 | LT | 22.06.2022 | LV | 22.06.2022 | MC | 22.06.2022 | NL | 22.06.2022 | PL | 22.06.2022 | RO | 22.06.2022 | RS | 22.06.2022 | SE | 22.06.2022 | SI | 22.06.2022 | SK | 22.06.2022 | SM | 22.06.2022 | BG | 22.09.2022 | NO | 22.09.2022 | GR | 23.09.2022 | IS | 22.10.2022 | PT | 24.10.2022 | AT | 20.03.2023 | IE | 20.03.2023 | LU | 20.03.2023 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/11] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
IT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
IE | 20.03.2023 | ||
LU | 20.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
IE | 20.03.2023 | ||
LU | 20.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
LU | 20.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | CZ | 22.06.2022 | |
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | CZ | 22.06.2022 | |
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 22.06.2022 | |
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 22.06.2022 | |
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004054821 (WARREN CHRISTOPHER E [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0015] , [0124] , [0160] *; | [XI]EP1712968 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0008] , [0014] , [0016] , [0017] , [0023] , [0024] * [I] 2,7,8,10; | [XI]US2011227556 (IVCHENKO OLEXIY [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0019] , [0050] - [0051] - [0 58] , [0059] , [0 83] , [0 85] , [0104] - [0105] - [0145] , [0154] *[I] 2,4,8,10; | [XI]CN202008597U (UNIV ZHEJIANG) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2-10; | [X]US2012197473 (KSHATRIYA TEJAS KRISHNA [IN]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0064] , [0072] , [0088] *; | [XI]EP3154151 (GULFSTREAM AEROSPACE CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] - [0029] - [0044] , [0045] * [I] 4,7-10 | Examination | US2015378960 | - Anonymous, "Programmieren lernen am Raspberry Pi: GPIO Pins steuern", (20170101), URL: https://tutorials-raspberrypi.de/raspberry-pi-gpio-erklaerung-beginner-programmierung-lernen/, (20210909), XP055839471 |