EP3355642 - OPPORTUNISTIC RELAY SCHEDULING IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JI, Tingfang Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
AZARIAN YAZDI, Kambiz Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
LIN, Dexu Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
STAMOULIS, Anastasios Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
CHAKRABARTI, Arnab Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | Petzold, Silke Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/31] | Petzold, Silke Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18162928.8 | 02.07.2009 | [2018/31] | Priority number, date | US20080078239P | 03.07.2008 Original published format: US 78239 P | US20090483125 | 11.06.2009 Original published format: US 483125 | [2018/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3355642 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/08, // H04W72/04, H04W84/04, H04W88/04 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
H04B7/15542 (EP,US);
H04B7/14 (KR);
H04W72/541 (EP,US);
H04W72/04 (KR);
H04W72/12 (KR);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] | Title | German: | OPPORTUNISTISCHE RELAISPLANUNG IN DER DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATION | [2018/31] | English: | OPPORTUNISTIC RELAY SCHEDULING IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS | [2018/31] | French: | PROGRAMMATION DE RELAIS OPPORTUNISTE DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2018/31] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/27] | 15.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09774547.5 / EP2301291 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5428603 (KIVETT JAMES A [US]); | [A]US2004071107 (KATS MARAT G [US], et al); | [A]WO2007096762 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [A]EP1919160 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |