EP3355630 - MINIMIZINING MESSAGE PROPAGATION TIMES WHEN BRIEF DATALINK INTERRUPTIONS OCCUR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road P.O.Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCGUFFIN, Thomas F. Honeywell International Inc. Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 02 /
JUDD, Thomas D. Honeywell International Inc. Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2018/31] | Application number, filing date | 18163636.6 | 10.11.2015 | [2018/31] | Priority number, date | US201414543466 | 17.11.2014 Original published format: US201414543466 | [2018/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3355630 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3355630 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00, G08G5/00, H04B7/185, H04L29/06 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
G08G5/0013 (EP,US);
H04L45/28 (US);
H04B7/18506 (EP,US);
H04L1/188 (US);
H04L69/16 (EP,US);
H04L69/28 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] | Title | German: | MINIMIERUNG VON NACHRICHTENVERBREITUNGSZEITEN BEIM AUFTRETEN KURZER DATENVERBINDUNGSUNTERBRECHUNGEN | [2018/31] | English: | MINIMIZINING MESSAGE PROPAGATION TIMES WHEN BRIEF DATALINK INTERRUPTIONS OCCUR | [2018/31] | French: | MINIMISATION DES DURÉES DE PROPAGATION DE MESSAGES LORSQUE DE BRÈVES INTERRUPTIONS DE LIAISON DE DONNÉES SE PRODUISENT | [2018/31] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 23.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15193971.7 / EP3021624 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.11.2015 | AL | 24.04.2019 | AT | 24.04.2019 | CY | 24.04.2019 | CZ | 24.04.2019 | DK | 24.04.2019 | EE | 24.04.2019 | ES | 24.04.2019 | FI | 24.04.2019 | HR | 24.04.2019 | IT | 24.04.2019 | LT | 24.04.2019 | LV | 24.04.2019 | MC | 24.04.2019 | MK | 24.04.2019 | MT | 24.04.2019 | NL | 24.04.2019 | PL | 24.04.2019 | RO | 24.04.2019 | RS | 24.04.2019 | SE | 24.04.2019 | SI | 24.04.2019 | SK | 24.04.2019 | SM | 24.04.2019 | TR | 24.04.2019 | BG | 24.07.2019 | NO | 24.07.2019 | GR | 25.07.2019 | IS | 24.08.2019 | PT | 24.08.2019 | IE | 10.11.2019 | LU | 10.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/48] | HU | 10.11.2015 | |
AL | 24.04.2019 | ||
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
MT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 10.11.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 10.11.2015 | |
AL | 24.04.2019 | ||
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
MT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 10.11.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 10.11.2015 | |
AL | 24.04.2019 | ||
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 10.11.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 10.11.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 10.11.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 10.11.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 24.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5297143 (FRIDRICH MAREK J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 9 - column 6, line 2 ** column 20, line 11 - column 24, line 42; tables IV, V *; | [A]EP2012493 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-4; claims 1-10 *; | [A]EP2211323 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1; claims 1-10 *; | [A]EP2363847 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-6; claims 1-10 * |