EP3547051 - CONVEYOR SYSTEM CONTROLLER, CONVEYOR SYSTEM AND METHOD OF DATA SYNCHRONISATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EWAB Engineering AB Kungs Starbyvägen 8 592 91 Vadstena / SE | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Georg, Ingo Presselstraße 9 34346 Hann. Münden / DE | 02 /
Lundin, Roland Ripgatan 18 592 42 Vadstena / SE | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [2019/40] | Application number, filing date | 18163988.1 | 26.03.2018 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3547051 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3547051 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418, H04L29/08 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
G05B19/4185 (EP);
G05B19/41815 (US);
B65G43/00 (US);
H04L67/12 (EP);
H04L67/34 (EP);
H04L7/0008 (US);
G05B2219/25066 (EP);
G05B2219/25068 (EP);
G05B2219/25094 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/40] | G05B19/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Title | German: | FÖRDERSYSTEMSTEUERGERÄT, FÖRDERSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DATENSYNCHRONISATION | [2019/40] | English: | CONVEYOR SYSTEM CONTROLLER, CONVEYOR SYSTEM AND METHOD OF DATA SYNCHRONISATION | [2019/40] | French: | ORGANE DE COMMANDE DE SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT, SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT ET PROCÉDÉ DE SYNCHRONISATION DE DONNÉES | [2019/40] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 09.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.07.2020 | CY | 01.07.2020 | DK | 01.07.2020 | EE | 01.07.2020 | FI | 01.07.2020 | HR | 01.07.2020 | LT | 01.07.2020 | LV | 01.07.2020 | MC | 01.07.2020 | MK | 01.07.2020 | MT | 01.07.2020 | RS | 01.07.2020 | SM | 01.07.2020 | BG | 01.10.2020 | NO | 01.10.2020 | GR | 02.10.2020 | IS | 01.11.2020 | PT | 02.11.2020 | IE | 26.03.2021 | LU | 26.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
MK | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 26.03.2021 | ||
LU | 26.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 26.03.2021 | ||
LU | 26.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 26.03.2021 | ||
LU | 26.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 26.03.2021 | ||
LU | 26.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 26.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | DK | 01.07.2020 | |
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 01.07.2020 | |
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | BG | 01.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6701214 (WIELEBSKI WAYNE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 9, line 28 - column 17, line 20; figures 1-9 *; | [A]EP2477309 (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-7 * | by applicant | EP3214024 |