EP3382858 - COOLING OF AN ELECTRIC MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jongsu 19, Yangjae-daero 11 gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 02 /
KWAK, Taehee 19, Yangjae-daero 11 gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 03 /
MOON, Jungwook 19, Yangjae-daero 11 gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 04 /
JO, Changhum 19, Yangjae-daero 11 gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | [2018/40] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/40] | Application number, filing date | 18164251.3 | 27.03.2018 | [2018/40] | Priority number, date | US201762477451P | 28.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762477451 P | WO2017KR11308 | 13.10.2017 Original published format: PCT/KR2017/011308 | [2018/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3382858 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/20, H02K9/18, H02K9/19 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
H02K9/19 (EP,US);
H02K11/25 (US);
H02K11/30 (US);
H02K5/203 (EP,US);
H02K11/33 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] |
Former [2018/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLUNG EINES ELEKTROMOTORS | [2018/40] | English: | COOLING OF AN ELECTRIC MOTOR | [2018/40] | French: | REFROIDISSEMENT D'UN MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2018/40] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/40] | 01.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/27] | 01.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2006174642 (NAGASHIMA JAMES M [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4,5,15 * figures 3,4 * [A] 6-14; | [XAYI]US2013119793 (HOFKIRCHNER RAINER [AT], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0033]; figure 1 * [A] 6-14 [Y] 3 [I] 15; | [Y]US2014077633 (NAGAO TOSHIO [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0025]; figure 5 *; | [A]DE102015205141 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1* figure 1 * |