EP3528545 - METHOD, SYSTEM, AND DEVICE FOR MANAGING NETWORK ENTRY AND BTS HANDOVER IN LAND-TO-SEA WIRELESS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wipro Limited Doddakannelli Sarjapur Road Bangalore 560 035 Karnataka / IN | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUTHUSWAMY, Sridharan 2541 Coconut Drive San Jose, California 95148 / US | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2019/34] | Application number, filing date | 18164442.8 | 27.03.2018 | [2019/34] | Priority number, date | US201815897172 | 15.02.2018 Original published format: US201815897172 | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3528545 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3528545 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/30 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
H04W36/304 (EP,US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W16/18 (US);
H04W36/08 (EP,US);
H04W36/20 (US);
H04W36/36 (EP,US);
H04W48/20 (US);
H04W72/542 (US);
H04W76/10 (US);
H04W36/00837 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/14] |
Former [2019/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWALTUNG VON NETZWERKEINGABE UND BTS-ÜBERGABE IN DRAHTLOSEN LAND-SEE-NETZWERKEN | [2019/34] | English: | METHOD, SYSTEM, AND DEVICE FOR MANAGING NETWORK ENTRY AND BTS HANDOVER IN LAND-TO-SEA WIRELESS NETWORKS | [2019/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET DISPOSITIF DE GESTION D'ENTRÉE DE RÉSEAU ET TRANSFERT BTS DANS DES RÉSEAUX SANS FIL TERRE VERS MER | [2019/34] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/14] | 21.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2018 | AL | 02.06.2021 | AT | 02.06.2021 | CY | 02.06.2021 | CZ | 02.06.2021 | DK | 02.06.2021 | EE | 02.06.2021 | ES | 02.06.2021 | FI | 02.06.2021 | HR | 02.06.2021 | IT | 02.06.2021 | LT | 02.06.2021 | LV | 02.06.2021 | MC | 02.06.2021 | MK | 02.06.2021 | MT | 02.06.2021 | NL | 02.06.2021 | PL | 02.06.2021 | RO | 02.06.2021 | RS | 02.06.2021 | SE | 02.06.2021 | SI | 02.06.2021 | SK | 02.06.2021 | SM | 02.06.2021 | BG | 02.09.2021 | NO | 02.09.2021 | GR | 03.09.2021 | IS | 02.10.2021 | PT | 04.10.2021 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 27.03.2018 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
MK | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
MK | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
LT | 02.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8060091 (GOERANSSON BO [SE]); | [A]KR101491979B |