EP3385163 - AN AIRCRAFT COMPRISING A HIGH-PRESSURE WATER SUPPLY AND DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÜBBERT, Dr. Tim c/o Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
SCHREINER, Dr. Axel c/o Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
REMPE, Dr. Michael c/o Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Bird & Bird LLP - Hamburg Am Sandtorkai 50 20457 Hamburg / DE | [2024/13] |
Former [2018/41] | Bird & Bird LLP Großer Grasbrook 9 20457 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18164717.3 | 28.03.2018 | [2018/41] | Priority number, date | DE201710107558 | 07.04.2017 Original published format: DE102017107558 | [2018/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3385163 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3385163 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/02, B64D11/04 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
B64D11/02 (EP,US);
E03B7/075 (US);
B64D11/04 (EP,US);
E03B11/06 (US);
E03B7/04 (US);
E03B7/09 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] |
Former [2018/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FLUGZEUG MIT EINEM HOCHDRUCKWASSERVERSORGUNGS- UND -VERTEILUNGSSYSTEM | [2018/41] | English: | AN AIRCRAFT COMPRISING A HIGH-PRESSURE WATER SUPPLY AND DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM | [2018/41] | French: | AÉRONEF COMPRENANT UN SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION ET DE DISTRIBUTION D'EAU À HAUTE PRESSION | [2018/41] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 09.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 23.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24165825.1 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.07.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 23.07.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.08.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5062456 (COOKE HORISE M [US], et al); | [AD]DE4227516 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2010221642 (FRAHM LARS [DE], et al); | [YA]US2012151666 (DANNENBERG ANDREAS [DE]); | [A]WO2014055785 (BE AEROSPACE INC [US]) |