EP3385120 - DEVICE FOR PROTECTING A LOAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kässbohrer Transport Technik GmbH Gewerbestrasse 30 5301 Eugendorf / AT | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOLLER, Stephan Salzweg 14 5082 Grödig / AT | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Postfach 85 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/41] | Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Postfach 85 6010 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 18165889.9 | 05.04.2018 | [2018/41] | Priority number, date | AT20170050273 | 05.04.2017 Original published format: AT 502732017 | [2018/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3385120 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3385120 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60P3/079, B60P7/08 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
B60P3/079 (EP);
B60P7/08 (AT);
B60P7/0807 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] |
Former [2018/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR SICHERUNG EINER LADUNG | [2018/41] | English: | DEVICE FOR PROTECTING A LOAD | [2018/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION D'UNE CHARGE | [2018/41] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 04.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.04.2018 | AL | 01.04.2020 | CY | 01.04.2020 | CZ | 01.04.2020 | DK | 01.04.2020 | EE | 01.04.2020 | ES | 01.04.2020 | FI | 01.04.2020 | HR | 01.04.2020 | LT | 01.04.2020 | LV | 01.04.2020 | MC | 01.04.2020 | MK | 01.04.2020 | MT | 01.04.2020 | NL | 01.04.2020 | PL | 01.04.2020 | RO | 01.04.2020 | RS | 01.04.2020 | SE | 01.04.2020 | SI | 01.04.2020 | SK | 01.04.2020 | SM | 01.04.2020 | TR | 01.04.2020 | IE | 05.04.2020 | LU | 05.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | BG | 01.07.2020 | NO | 01.07.2020 | GR | 02.07.2020 | IS | 01.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 05.04.2018 | |
AL | 01.04.2020 | ||
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
MT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
TR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 05.04.2020 | ||
LU | 05.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 05.04.2020 | ||
LU | 05.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 05.04.2020 | ||
LU | 05.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
LU | 05.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
LU | 05.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
LU | 05.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 01.04.2020 | |
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | BG | 01.07.2020 | |
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | BG | 01.07.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3685778 (BERNS HARALD) [X] 1-5,8,10 * figure - *; | [X]GB2164081 (TOLEMAN HOLDING COMPANY LIMITE) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2675750 (LEBRE CHARLES [FR], et al) [X] 1,8* figures 5-10 *; | [X]US5265992 (JENSEN RICHARD H [US]) [X] 1-8 * figures 5,5a *; | [X]US2007212185 (FRETT JOHN W [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9 * figures 33-38 * |