EP3413232 - METHOD, DEVICE, AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING ROAD DIVIDING OBJECT AS WELL AS COMPUTER PROGRAM AND NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2020/19] |
Former [2018/50] | For all designated states Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Na c/o Ricoh Software Research Center (Beijing) Co. Ltd. Tengda Plaza 28th Floor No. 168, Xiwai Street Haidian District, Beijing 100044 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Dianchao c/o Ricoh Software Research Center (Beijing) Co. Ltd. Tengda Plaza 28th Floor No. 168, Xiwai Street Haidian District, Beijing 100044 / CN | 03 /
SHI, Zhongchao c/o Ricoh Software Research Center (Beijing) Co. Ltd. Tengda Plaza 28th Floor No. 168, Xiwai Street Haidian District, Beijing 100044 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Gang c/o Ricoh Software Research Center (Beijing) Co. Ltd Tengda Plaza 28th Floor No. 168, Xiwai Street Haidian District, Beijing 100044 / CN | [2018/50] | Representative(s) | Watkin, Timothy Lawrence Harvey Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/50] | Watkin, Timothy Lawrence Harvey Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House The Oxford Science Park Heatley Road Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 18166032.5 | 06.04.2018 | [2018/50] | Priority number, date | CN201710431547 | 09.06.2017 Original published format: CN201710431547 | [2018/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3413232 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06T7/12 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
G06T7/12 (EP,US);
G06V20/588 (EP,CN,US);
G06V10/44 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30256 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG VON STRASSENTEILUNGSOBJEKTEN SOWIE COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND NICHTTRANSITORISCHES COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM | [2018/50] | English: | METHOD, DEVICE, AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING ROAD DIVIDING OBJECT AS WELL AS COMPUTER PROGRAM AND NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM | [2018/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION D'OBJETS DE DIVISION DE ROUTE AINSI QUE PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR NON TRANSITOIRE | [2018/50] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/50] | 11.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/13] | 22.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - SHENGYAN ZHOU ET AL, "A novel lane detection based on geometrical model and Gabor filter", INTELLIGENT VEHICLES SYMPOSIUM (IV), 2010 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100621), ISBN 978-1-4244-7866-8, pages 59 - 64, XP031732248 [I] 1-12 * page 59 - page 63 * | [L] - RASMUSSEN C, "Grouping dominant orientations for ill-structured road following", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2004 IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION 27 JUNE-2 JULY 2004 WASHINGTON, DC, USA, IEEE, PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2004 IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION IEE, (20040627), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/CVPR.2004.1315069, ISBN 978-0-7695-2158-9, pages 470 - 477, XP010708805 [L] 2-4,8 * page 471 - page 473 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2004.1315069 | [A] - HUI KONG ET AL, "General Road Detection From a Single Image", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (201008), vol. 19, no. 8, doi:10.1109/TIP.2010.2045715, ISSN 1057-7149, pages 2211 - 2220, XP011328592 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 2212 - page 2214 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIP.2010.2045715 |