EP3396046 - WASHING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A WASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Straße 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zielke, Marcel Miele & Cie. KG Weidkamp 12 59320 Ennigerloh / DE | 02 /
Sieding, Dirk Miele & Cie. KG Haydnstr. 3 44534 Lünen / DE | 03 /
Löffler, Alexander Miele & Cie. KG Ransohoffweg 12 33102 Paderborn / DE | [2018/44] | Application number, filing date | 18167550.5 | 16.04.2018 | [2018/44] | Priority number, date | DE201710108959 | 26.04.2017 Original published format: DE102017108959 | [2018/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3396046 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | D06F35/00, // D06F37/42, D06F39/08, D06F33/02, D06F39/00, D06F39/02 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
D06F33/36 (EP,US);
D06F2103/04 (EP,US);
D06F2103/06 (EP,US);
D06F2103/16 (EP,US);
D06F2103/38 (EP,US);
D06F2105/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] |
Former [2018/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER WASCHMASCHINE UND WASCHMASCHINE | [2018/44] | English: | WASHING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A WASHING MACHINE | [2018/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN LAVE-LINGE ET LAVE-LINGE | [2018/44] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/24] | 30.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05345091 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-9 * abstract ** paragraphs [0008] , [0017] , [0022] , [0024] , [0025] , [0027]; figure - *; | JPH06254284 [ ] (SHARP KK) [ ] * abstract *; | [Y]DE19928657 (DIEHL AKO STIFTUNG GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 4 * abstract *; | [I]JP3138354B (SHARP KK) [I] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [XI]JP2003245490 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,3,5,6,8,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0015] , [0 22] , [0023] , [0027] , [0028]; figure -; claim - * [I] 2,4,7; | [I]DE102010028368 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0010] - [0015] - [0041] , [0052] , [0053] *; | [XI]CN103485122 (WUXI LITTLE SWAN CO LTD) [X] 1,3,5-9 * paragraphs [0071] , [0107]; figure -; claims 1,4 * * abstract * [I] 2,4; | [XI]WO2016020873 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,5-9 * abstract * * page 3, lines 18-28 * * page 4, paragraph 4 - line 25; figure - * [I] 2,4; | [XY]DE102014012525 (HUTTARY RUDOLF [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-9 * the whole document * [Y] 4 |