EP3381445 - AQUEOUS FORMULATION OF ANTIBODY STABLISED BY ANTIOXIDANTS FOR PARENTERAL ADMINISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, California 91320-1799 / US | [2018/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLOEY, Christopher, James 5611 Foxwood Drive, Apartment C Oak Park, CA California 91377 / US | 02 /
KO, Jason 438 East Gainsborough Road Thousand Oaks, CA California 91360 / US | 03 /
LI, Tiansheng 160 Via Fiesta Street Newbury Park, CA California 91320 / US | [2018/40] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/43] |
Former [2018/40] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18167567.9 | 13.11.2008 | [2018/40] | Priority number, date | US20070988354P | 15.11.2007 Original published format: US 988354 P | [2018/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3381445 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3381445 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3381445 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K38/18, A61K38/19, A61K39/395 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
A61K38/1816 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K39/39591 (EP,US);
A61K47/22 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61P7/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/34] |
Former [2018/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE ANTIKÖRPERFORMULIERUNG MIT STABILISIERUNG DURCH ANTIOXIDANTIEN ZUR PARENTERALEN VERABREICHUNG | [2018/40] | English: | AQUEOUS FORMULATION OF ANTIBODY STABLISED BY ANTIOXIDANTS FOR PARENTERAL ADMINISTRATION | [2018/40] | French: | FORMULATION AQUEUSE D'ANTICORPS STABILISÉE PAR DES ANTIOXYDANTS POUR ADMINISTRATION PARENTÉRALE | [2018/40] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 16.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08849496.8 / EP2219602 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.01.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 27.01.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.02.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 01.11.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 01.11.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.11.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | MC | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | LU | 13.11.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SK | 25.10.2023 | ||
LU | 13.11.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
LU | 13.11.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
LU | 13.11.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO02103029 (CLEARANT INC [US], et al) [X] 1,12,14,15 * page 14, paragraph l - page 15, paragraph l * * page 19, paragraph 3 - page 21, paragraph 1 * * page 21, line 23 * [I] 5,13; | [X]WO2007037795 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4,12-15 * claims, esp. claims 19-22; page 14, line 1; page 8, paragraph 1; claims 1,4,11-18 *; | [T] - WANG W ET AL, "ANTIBODY STRUCTURE, INSTABILITY, AND FORMULATION", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY AND AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, US, (20070101), vol. 96, no. 1, doi:10.1002/JPS.20727, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 1 - 26, XP009084505 [T] * page 5, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 8, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 1 * * page 13, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 1 * * page 14, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 3 * * page 16, column r, paragraph 3 * * page 21, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.20727 | [XI] - GUPTA SUPRIYA ET AL, "Development of a multidose formulation for a humanized monoclonal antibody using experimental design techniques", AAPS PHARMSCI, SPRINGER NEW YORK, NEW YORK, (20030404), vol. 5, no. 2, doi:10.1208/PS050208, pages 1 - 9, XP035718636 [X] 1,3,9,12-15 * page 1, column r, paragraph l - page 2, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 2, column l, paragraph 3 * * page 5, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 1; table 3 * [I] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1208/ps050208 | [XI] - LAM X M ET AL, "ANTIOXIDANTS FOR PREVENTION OF METHIONINE OXIDATION IN RECOMBINANT MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY HER2", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY AND AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, US, (19971101), vol. 86, no. 11, doi:10.1021/JS970143S, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 1250 - 1255, XP008038003 [X] 1,9,10,12-15 * page 1251; table 1 * * page 1254, column l, paragraph l - page 1255, column r, paragraph 1; figures 4,5 * [I] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js970143s | [XI] - DAUGHERTY A L ET AL, "Formulation and delivery issues for monoclonal antibody therapeutics", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 58, no. 5-6, doi:10.1016/J.ADDR.2006.03.011, ISSN 0169-409X, (20060807), pages 686 - 706, (20060807), XP024892149 [X] 1,9,10,12-15 * page 688, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 2 * * page 690, column l, paragraph l - page 691, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 697; table 1 * [I] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2006.03.011 | [A] - POTIER ET AL, "Gallic esters of sucrose as a new class of antioxidants", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, (19990423), vol. 40, no. 17, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 3387 - 3390, XP022502864 [A] 1,12,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(99)00496-7 | [A] - ABDELWAHED ET AL, "Study of antimutagenic and antioxidant activities of Gallic acid and 1,2,3,4,6-pentagalloylglucose from Pistacia lentiscus", CHEMICO-BIOLOGICAL INTERACTIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE IRLAND, IR, (20061222), vol. 165, no. 1, ISSN 0009-2797, pages 1 - 13, XP005813189 [A] 1,12,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cbi.2006.10.003 | by applicant | US4703008 | EP0404097 | WO9105867 | WO9110741 | WO9117271 | WO9201047 | WO9311161 | WO9505465 | US5441868 | US5547933 | WO9634096 | WO9638557 | US5618698 | US5621080 | US5686292 | US5756349 | WO9824893 | US5767078 | US5773569 | US5789554 | US5830851 | US5856298 | US5955422 | US5986047 | WO9966054 | US6030086 | WO0024893 | WO0024782 | WO0061637 | WO0136489 | US6310078 | WO0181405 | WO0214356 | WO0219963 | WO0220034 | US6391633 | WO0249673 | US6468529 | US2002155998 | WO02085940 | US2002199213 | WO03002713 | US2003023586 | US2003031667 | WO03029291 | WO03030833 | US2003077753 | US2003082749 | WO03041600 | US6583272 | US2003118592 | US6586398 | WO03055526 | US2003133939 | WO03057134 | WO03059951 | US2003138421 | US2003143202 | WO03084477 | US2003194404 | US2003195156 | US2003215444 | WO03094858 | US2003229023 | US2003235582 | WO2004002417 | WO2004002424 | US2004009902 | WO2004009627 | US2004018191 | WO2004018667 | WO2004024761 | US2004071694 | US2004071702 | WO2004033651 | WO2004035603 | US2004086503 | US2004091961 | US2004097712 | WO2004043382 | US6750369 | US6756480 | WO2004058988 | US2004143857 | US2004157293 | US2004175379 | US2004175824 | US2004181033 | US6803453 | US2004202655 | US2004229318 | US2004228859 | WO2004101600 | WO2004101606 | WO2004101611 | WO2004106373 | US2004248815 | US6835809 | US2004266690 | US2004265307 | WO2005001025 | WO2005001136 | US2005004353 | US2005008642 | US2005019914 | US2005026834 | US2005037421 | WO2005016970 | WO2005017107 | WO2005021579 | WO2005025606 | US2005074821 | WO2005032460 | US2005084906 | US2005089932 | US2005096461 | US2005107297 | US2005107591 | WO2005047331 | US2005112694 | US6900292 | US2005118643 | WO2005051327 | US2005124045 | US2005124564 | US2005137329 | US2005136049 | US2005136063 | US2005142642 | US2005143292 | WO2005058967 | WO2005063808 | WO2005063809 | US2005153879 | US6919426 | US2005158822 | US2005158832 | WO2005070451 | US2005170457 | US2005181359 | US2005181482 | US2005186203 | US2005192211 | WO2005081687 | WO2005084711 | US2005202538 | WO2005092369 | US2005227289 | WO2005100403 | WO2005103076 | US2005244409 | US2005244408 | US2005249728 | WO2006002646 | WO2006013472 | US2006040858 | US2006040358 | WO2006029094 | US7030226 | US2006088906 | US7037498 | WO2006050959 | US2006111279 | US2006135431 | US7084245 | WO2006081171 | US7153507 | WO2006138729 | WO2007000328 | WO2007011941 | WO2007012614 | US7217689 | US2007110747 | US7220410 | - MANNING et al., Pharmaceutical Research, (19890000), vol. 6 | - WANG; KOWAL, J. Parenteral Drug Association, (19800000), vol. 34, page 452 | - AVIS et al., Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms: Parenteral Medications, (19920000), vol. 1 | - ANDREWS, J. Antimicrobial Chemotherapy, (20010000), vol. 48, no. 1, pages 5 - 16 | - JONES et al., Nature, (19860000), vol. 321, page 522 525 | - MORRISON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., U.S.A., (19840000), vol. 81, page 6851 6855 | - MORRISON; OI, Adv. Immunol., (19880000), vol. 44, pages 65 - 92 | - VERHOEYER et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 239, page 1534 1536 | - PADLAN, Molec. Immun., (19910000), vol. 28, pages 489 - 498 | - PADLAN, Molec. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 31, no. 3, page 169 217 | - KETTLEBOROUGH, C.A. et al., Protein Eng., (19910000), vol. 4, no. 7, page 773 83 | - CO, M. S. et al., J. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 152, pages 2968 - 2976 | - STUDNICKA et al., Protein Engineering, (19940000), vol. 7, pages 805 - 814 | - CATON; KOPROWSKI, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 6450 - 6454 | - JAKOBOVITS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, page 2551 | - JAKOBOVITS et al., Nature, (19930000), vol. 362, pages 255 - 258 | - BRUGGERMANN et al., Year in Immuno., (19930000), vol. 7, page 33 | - WARD et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - BIRD et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - HUSTON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - GRUBER et al., J. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 152, page 5368 | - HOLLINGER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - OLAFSEN et al., Protein Eng Des Sel., (20040400), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 315 - 23 | - ZAPATA et al., Protein Eng., (19950000), vol. 8, no. 10, pages 1057 - 1062 | - NERI et al., J Mol Biol., (19950000), vol. 246, pages 367 - 73 | - SCHOONJANS et al., J Immunol., (20000000), vol. 165, pages 7050 - 57 | - WILLEMS et al., J Chromatogr B Analyt Technol Biomed Life Sci., (20030000), vol. 786, pages 161 - 76 | - BIOCCA et al., EMBO J., (19900000), vol. 9, pages 101 - 108 | - COLBY et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA., (20040000), vol. 101, pages 17616 - 21 | - MHASHILKAR et al., EMBO J, (19950000), vol. 14, pages 1542 - 51 | - WHEELER et al., FASEB J., (20030000), vol. 17, pages 1733 - 5 | - HENG et al., Med Hypotheses., (20050000), vol. 64, pages 1105 - 8 | - CORTEZ-RETAMOZO et al., Cancer Research, (20040000), vol. 64, pages 2853 - 57 | - DESMYTER et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20010000), vol. 276, pages 26285 - 90 | - EWERT et al., Biochemistry, (20020000), vol. 41, pages 3628 - 36 | - CHOTHIA et al., J. Mol.Biol., (19870000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - SHIELDS et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20010000), vol. 276, no. 9, pages 6591 - 6604 | - KOSTELNY et al., J. Immunol., (19920000), vol. 148, pages 1547 - 1553 | - HOLLINGER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 48 | - ZAPATA et al., Protein Eng., (19950000), vol. 8, pages 1057 - 62 | - SILVERMAN et al., Nat Biotech, (20050000), vol. 23, no. 12, pages 1556 - 1561 | - RAZEGHIFARD et al., Current Protein & Peptide Science, (20070000), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 3 - 18 | - HOSSE et al., Protein Science, (20060000), vol. 15, pages 14 - 27 | - GILL et al., Current Opin. Biotechnol., (20060000), vol. 17, pages 653 - 658 | - SKERRA, J. Mol. Recognit., (20000000), vol. 13, pages 167 - 187 | - EGRIE et al., British J Cancer, (20010000), vol. 84, no. 1, pages 3 - 10 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 501423-23-0 | - LU et al., J Biol Chem., (20040000), vol. 279, pages 2856 - 65 | - MALONEY et al., Cancer Res., (20030000), vol. 63, pages 5073 - 83 | - COHEN et al., Clinical Cancer Res., (20050000), vol. 11, pages 2063 - 73 | - THAKUR et al., Mol. Immunol., (19990000), vol. 36, pages 1107 - 1115 | - SCOTT MARKEL; DARRYL LEON, SEQUENCE ANALYSIS IN A NUTSHELL: A GUIDE TO COMMON TOOLS AND DATABASES, O'Reilly & Associates, (20030000), pages 47 - 51 | - ALTSCHUL et al., "Basic Local Alignment Research Tool", J Mol Biol, (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - DOOLITTLE, R. F., "Searching through sequence databases", Met Enz., (19900000), vol. 183, pages 99 - 110 | - MEYERS; MILLER, "Optimal alignments in linear space", Comput. Applica. in Biosci, (19880000), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1093/bioinformatics/4.1.11, pages 11 - 17, XP009076513 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/4.1.11 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, "A general method applicable to the search for similarities in amino acid sequence of two proteins", J Mol Biol, (19700000), vol. 48, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-2836(70)90057-4, pages 443 - 453, XP024011703 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(70)90057-4 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, "Identification of common molecular subsequences", J Mol Biol, (19810000), vol. 147, page 1950 | - ANDREWS, J., Antimicrobial Chemotherapy, (20010000), vol. 48, no. 1, pages 5 - 16 | WO2004US03742 | US20050068289 | US20050700265 | US20050713433 | US20050713478 | WO2005US46493 | US20060794771 | US20060843430 |