EP3395634 - METHOD FOR GENERATING DRIVING BEHAVIOUR FOR AUTONOMOUS VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Strasse 667 80995 München / DE | ||
Former [2018/44] | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus AG Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagner, Philipp Burgpflegerstr. 15a 86316 Friedberg / DE | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Ridlerstraße 57 80339 München / DE | [2024/23] |
Former [2018/44] | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestraße 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18167686.7 | 17.04.2018 | [2018/44] | Priority number, date | DE20171004033 | 26.04.2017 Original published format: DE102017004033 | [2018/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3395634 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3395634 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60W50/00, B60W40/04, B60W40/09, // G08G1/16 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
B60W50/0098 (EP,US);
B60W40/04 (EP);
B60W40/09 (EP);
B60W2050/0088 (EP);
B60W2552/00 (EP);
B60W2552/53 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/44] | B60W40/04, B60W40/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] |
Former [2018/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN EINES FAHRVERHALTENS BEI AUTONOMEN FAHRZEUGEN | [2018/44] | English: | METHOD FOR GENERATING DRIVING BEHAVIOUR FOR AUTONOMOUS VEHICLES | [2018/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'OBTENTION D'UNE SOUPLESSE DE CONDUITE DANS DES VÉHICULES AUTONOMES | [2018/44] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 16.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.12.2023 | 04.12.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102009015170 (DAIMLER AG [DE]); | [XI]DE102012009890 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) | Examination | DE112009004626T | by applicant | DE3912353 | EP0913751 |