EP3395134 - TOWED IMPLEMENT WITH HEIGHT ADJUSTABLE HITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNH Industrial Belgium NV Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Craemer, Barbara Diksmuidse Heerweg 39 0.2 8200 Sint-Andries / BE | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | CNH Industrial IP Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/44] | CNH Industrial IP Department Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 18167806.1 | 17.04.2018 | [2018/44] | Priority number, date | BE20170005302 | 27.04.2017 Original published format: BE 201705302 | [2018/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3395134 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3395134 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01B59/042, A01F15/08 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
A01B59/042 (EP);
A01F15/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] |
Former [2018/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GESCHLEPPTES ARBEITSGERÄT MIT HÖHENVERSTELLBARER ANHÄNGEKUPPLUNG | [2018/44] | English: | TOWED IMPLEMENT WITH HEIGHT ADJUSTABLE HITCH | [2018/44] | French: | OUTIL TRACTÉ À ATTELAGE RÉGLABLE EN HAUTEUR | [2018/44] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/24] | 30.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2018 | AL | 10.06.2020 | AT | 10.06.2020 | CY | 10.06.2020 | CZ | 10.06.2020 | DK | 10.06.2020 | EE | 10.06.2020 | ES | 10.06.2020 | FI | 10.06.2020 | HR | 10.06.2020 | LT | 10.06.2020 | LV | 10.06.2020 | MC | 10.06.2020 | MK | 10.06.2020 | MT | 10.06.2020 | NL | 10.06.2020 | PL | 10.06.2020 | RO | 10.06.2020 | RS | 10.06.2020 | SE | 10.06.2020 | SI | 10.06.2020 | SK | 10.06.2020 | SM | 10.06.2020 | BG | 10.09.2020 | NO | 10.09.2020 | GR | 11.09.2020 | IS | 10.10.2020 | PT | 12.10.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 17.04.2018 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
MK | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 17.04.2018 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 10.06.2020 | |
NO | 10.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3912018 (BRUNDAGE JOHN F, et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-2 * * figures 1-2 *; | [A]WO2013090826 (HENNES MARK [US]) [A] 1-13* figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP3008985 (KVERNELAND GROUP RAVENNA SRL [IT]) [A] 1-13 * figure 1 * |