EP3367692 - DISPLAY DEVICE, DISPLAY CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saturn Licensing LLC 25 Madison Avenue New York, NY 10022-3211 / US | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kondo, Masao 1-1-7, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo, 1080075 / JP | 02 /
Yano, Ken 1-1-7, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo, 1080075 / JP | 03 /
Irimajiri, Mayu 1-1-7, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo, 1080075 / JP | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/35] | Application number, filing date | 18167816.0 | 13.12.2012 | [2018/35] | Priority number, date | JP20110288088 | 28.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011288088 | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3367692 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/41, H04N21/485, H04N5/445, G06F3/048, G09F9/00, G09G5/00, G09G5/377 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
H04N5/445 (EP,US);
H04N21/4316 (EP,RU,US);
H04N21/47 (RU,US);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06F3/0304 (EP,RU,US);
G06F3/147 (EP,US);
G09G5/003 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (US);
H04N21/4318 (EP,US);
H04N21/485 (EP,US);
H04N5/60 (EP,US);
H04N5/655 (US);
G06F2203/0384 (EP,US);
G06F3/1423 (EP,US);
G09G2320/08 (EP,US);
G09G2340/12 (EP,US);
G09G2340/14 (EP,US);
G09G2354/00 (EP,US);
H04N21/42202 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/35] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG, ANZEIGESTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2018/35] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE, DISPLAY CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2018/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'AFFICHAGE ET PROGRAMME | [2018/35] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 17.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/21] | 25.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.01.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12863600.8 / EP2800367 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004156192 (KERR DUNCAN [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0174] - paragraph [0198] * [I] 2-14; | [A]EP1505825 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2010205628 (DAVIS BRUCE L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0093] *; | [XI]US2011059793 (KONDO MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0159] - paragraph [0162] * * paragraph [0193] - paragraph [0194] * * paragraph [0204] - paragraph [0212] * [I] 2-14; | [XI]WO2011105579 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0138] - paragraph [0169] * [I] 2-14; | EP2541931 [ ] (SHARP KK [JP]) [ ] * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0138] - paragraph [0169] * | by applicant | JP2005267897 |