EP3372891 - VEHICLE LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 4-8-3, Takanawa Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8711 / JP | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIDO, Masaya c/o Koito Manufacturing Co. Ltd. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku SHIZUOKA-SHI SHIZUOKA, 424-8764 / JP | 02 /
ONODA, Yukihiro c/o Koito Manufacturing Co. Ltd. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku SHIZUOKA-SHI SHIZUOKA, 424-8764 / JP | 03 /
ITO, Toru c/o Koito Manufacturing Co. Ltd. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku SHIZUOKA-SHI SHIZUOKA, 424-8764 / JP | 04 /
ITO, Yoshiro c/o Koito Manufacturing Co. Ltd. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku SHIZUOKA-SHI SHIZUOKA, 424-8764 / JP | 05 /
IYODA, Haruhiko c/o Koito Manufacturing Co. Ltd. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku SHIZUOKA-SHI SHIZUOKA, 424-8764 / JP | 06 /
TSUKAMOTO, Hironori c/o Koito Manufacturing Co. Ltd. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku SHIZUOKA-SHI SHIZUOKA, 424-8764 / JP | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2018/37] | Application number, filing date | 18168905.0 | 22.12.2014 | [2018/37] | Priority number, date | JP20130267689 | 25.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013267689 | JP20140020576 | 05.02.2014 Original published format: JP 2014020576 | JP20140024494 | 12.02.2014 Original published format: JP 2014024494 | JP20140199841 | 30.09.2014 Original published format: JP 2014199841 | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3372891 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F21S43/19, F21S43/145, F21S45/10, F21Y115/15, H01L51/50, H05B33/06, F21Y105/00, F21V19/00, B60Q1/04, H05B33/08 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
F21S43/145 (EP,US);
B60Q1/0483 (US);
F21S43/195 (EP,US);
F21S45/10 (EP,US);
H05B33/06 (US);
H05B33/14 (US);
H05B33/24 (US);
H05B44/00 (EP,US);
F21S45/37 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] |
Former [2018/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGLAMPE | [2018/37] | English: | VEHICLE LAMP | [2018/37] | French: | LAMPE DE VÉHICULE | [2018/37] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 16.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.10.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14874435.2 / EP3088797 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 16.04.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 16.04.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 16.04.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 16.04.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0933589 (F G E DI FUCA GIACOMO [IT]) [A] 4 * abstract *; | [I]JP2009129700 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD) [I] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0032] , [0033]; figures 1-14 *; | [XAY]EP2221531 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1-5; claims 1- 9 * [A] 2 [Y] 5; | [I]JP2010192819 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD) [I] 1-5 * paragraphs [0014] , [0 34] , [0 35]; figures 1-18 *; | [A]US2011280045 (BAEK SEUNG-HWAN [KR], et al) [A] 4* abstract *; | [I]JP5020113B (FUJIFILM CORP) [I] 1,2,5 * figures 1-15 *; | [I]JP2013065523 (EL TECHNO INC) [I] 1,2 * figure 11 *; | [Y]EP2592331 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [Y] 5 * figures 1-18; claims 1-19 * * paragraph [0033] *; | [A]JP5227773B (YAMAGATA PROMOTIONAL ORG IND) [A] 1-5 * figures 1,9,11 *; | [IA]WO2013147010 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [I] 1,2 * figures 11-19, 26 * [A] 4 | by applicant | JP2013045523 |