EP3434858 - DUAL ROD DIRECTIONAL DRILLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vermeer Manufacturing Company 1210 Vermeer Road East Pella, IA 50219-0200 / US | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vos, Tanner 1934 Old Hwy 92 Harvey, IA Iowa 50119 / US | 02 /
Recker, Clint 2041 Carter Drive Pella, IA Iowa 50219 / US | 03 /
Apperson, Daniel Dwain Monroe, IA 50170 / US | [2022/34] |
Former [2019/05] | 01 /
Vos, Tanner 1934 Old Hwy 92 Harvey, IA Iowa 50119 / US | ||
02 /
Recker, Clint 2041 Carter Drive Pella, IA Iowa 50219 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/05] | Application number, filing date | 18170061.8 | 30.04.2018 | [2019/05] | Priority number, date | US201762492818P | 01.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762492818 P | US201762530610P | 10.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762530610 P | US201762530616P | 10.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762530616 P | US201762530642P | 10.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762530642 P | US201762566971P | 02.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762566971 P | US201762567624P | 03.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762567624 P | [2019/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3434858 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3434858 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3434858 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E21B7/04, E21B17/046, E21B17/18 | [2019/05] | CPC: |
E21B7/046 (EP,CN,US);
E21B7/06 (CN,US);
E21B17/046 (EP,CN,US);
E21B17/07 (US);
E21B17/18 (EP,CN,US);
E21B19/16 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] |
Former [2019/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DOPPELSTANGENRICHTBOHRSYSTEM | [2019/05] | English: | DUAL ROD DIRECTIONAL DRILLING SYSTEM | [2019/05] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FORAGE DIRECTIONNEL À DOUBLE TIGE | [2019/05] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 17.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.09.2022 | AT | 21.09.2022 | CZ | 21.09.2022 | DK | 21.09.2022 | EE | 21.09.2022 | ES | 21.09.2022 | FI | 21.09.2022 | HR | 21.09.2022 | LT | 21.09.2022 | LV | 21.09.2022 | MC | 21.09.2022 | NL | 21.09.2022 | PL | 21.09.2022 | RO | 21.09.2022 | RS | 21.09.2022 | SE | 21.09.2022 | SI | 21.09.2022 | SK | 21.09.2022 | SM | 21.09.2022 | NO | 21.12.2022 | GR | 22.12.2022 | IS | 21.01.2023 | PT | 23.01.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | CH | 30.04.2023 | FR | 30.04.2023 | GB | 30.04.2023 | IE | 30.04.2023 | LI | 30.04.2023 | LU | 30.04.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/11] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
FR | 30.04.2023 | ||
GB | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
LU | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
GB | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
LU | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
GB | 30.04.2023 | ||
LU | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
LU | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2011146490 (VERMEER MFG CO [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 8-11 * * page 7, line 3 - page 8, line 23 * * page 9, line 20 - page 10, line 23 * * page 12, line 16 - line 28 ** page 15, line 12 - line 29 * | Examination | DE1176079 |