EP3564687 - DETERMINATION OF POWER TRANSMISSION LINE PARAMETERS USING ASYNCHRONOUS MEASUREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dzafic, Izudin Laticka 1 A1 I 71000 Sarajevo / BA | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 18170499.0 | 03.05.2018 | [2019/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3564687 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3564687 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01R27/02, G01R31/08, H02H3/38 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
G01R27/02 (EP);
G01R31/085 (US);
G01R31/088 (EP,US);
H02H3/006 (EP);
Y02E40/70 (EP);
Y02E60/00 (EP);
Y04S10/22 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] |
Former [2019/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG VON ÜBERTRAGUNGSLEITUNGSPARAMETERN MITTELS ASYNCHRONER MESSUNGEN | [2022/44] | English: | DETERMINATION OF POWER TRANSMISSION LINE PARAMETERS USING ASYNCHRONOUS MEASUREMENTS | [2019/45] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DE PARAMÈTRES DE LIGNE DE TRANSMISSION AU MOYEN DE MESURES ASYNCHRONES | [2022/44] |
Former [2019/45] | BESTIMMUNG VON LEISTUNGSÜBERTRAGUNGSLEITUNGSPARAMETERN MITTELS ASYNCHRONER MESSUNGEN | ||
Former [2019/45] | DÉTERMINATION DE PARAMÈTRES DE LIGNE DE TRANSMISSION DE PUISSANCE AU MOYEN DE MESURES ASYNCHRONES | Examination procedure | 16.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 20.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.02.2023 | CZ | 22.02.2023 | DK | 22.02.2023 | EE | 22.02.2023 | ES | 22.02.2023 | FI | 22.02.2023 | HR | 22.02.2023 | LT | 22.02.2023 | LV | 22.02.2023 | MC | 22.02.2023 | NL | 22.02.2023 | PL | 22.02.2023 | RO | 22.02.2023 | RS | 22.02.2023 | SE | 22.02.2023 | SI | 22.02.2023 | SK | 22.02.2023 | SM | 22.02.2023 | IE | 03.05.2023 | LU | 03.05.2023 | NO | 22.05.2023 | GR | 23.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | IS | 22.06.2023 | PT | 22.06.2023 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/21] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
IE | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - IZYKOWSKI J ET AL, "Accurate Location of Faults on Power Transmission Lines With Use of Two-End Unsynchronized Measurements", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER DELIV, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20060430), vol. 21, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TPWRD.2005.858778, ISSN 0885-8977, pages 627 - 633, XP007904680 [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [00II] , [0 IV]; figure 1 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPWRD.2005.858778 | [A] - LAHMAR MUSTAFA ET AL, "Accurate methods for estimating transmission line parameters using synchronized and unsynchronized data", 2017 INTERNATIONAL ENERGY AND SUSTAINABILITY CONFERENCE (IESC), IEEE, (20171019), doi:10.1109/IESC.2017.8167474, pages 1 - 5, XP033276947 [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002]; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IESC.2017.8167474 | [A] - DI SHI ET AL, "Identification of short transmission-line parameters from synchrophasor measurements", POWER SYMPOSIUM, 2008. NAPS '08. 40TH NORTH AMERICAN, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080928), ISBN 978-1-4244-4283-6, pages 1 - 8, XP031558574 [A] 1-12 * paragraph [00VI] - paragraph [00VI] * | [A] - PAWEL DAWIDOWSKI ET AL, "ANALYTICAL SYNCHRONIZATION OF TWO-END MEASUREMENTS FOR TRANSMISSION LINE PARAMETERS ESTIMATION AND FAULT LOCATION", IU-JEEE, (20130403), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 1569 - 1574, XP055506704 [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002]; figures 1-2 * | [A] - INDULKAR C S ET AL, "Estimation of transmission line parameters from measurements", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ELECTRICAL POWER & ENERGY SYSTEMS, JORDAN HILL, OXFORD, GB, vol. 30, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.IJEPES.2007.08.003, ISSN 0142-0615, (20080630), pages 337 - 342, (20080125), XP022637220 [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [03.2]; figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0005] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijepes.2007.08.003 |