EP3567405 - PHOTON COUNTING SPECTRAL CT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/46] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEADMAN BOOKER, Roger c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HERRMANN, Christoph c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
ERHARD, Klaus c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
BRENDEL, Bernhard Johannes c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
DAERR, Heiner c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
SOSSIN, Artur c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 07 /
THRAN, Axel c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/46] | Application number, filing date | 18171174.8 | 08.05.2018 | [2019/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3567405 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/17, G01T1/24 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
G01T1/247 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (US);
G01T1/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEKTRALES CT BASIEREND AUF PHOTONENZÄHLUNG | [2019/46] | English: | PHOTON COUNTING SPECTRAL CT | [2019/46] | French: | TOMODENSITOMÉTRIE SPECTRALE DE COMPTAGE DE PHOTONS | [2019/46] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2004239377 (TUMER TUMAY O [US], et al) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0053] *[A] 1-10; | [XAY]WO2012095710 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 11-14 * page 3, line 12 - line 19; figure - * * page 2, line 21 - line 25 * * page 13, line 31 - page 14, line 2 * * page 10, line 13 - line 15 * * page 14, line 33 - page 15, line 2 * * page 14, line 20 - line 25 * [A] 1-10 [Y] 15 |