EP3407487 - HIGH LINEARITY SIGNAL AMPLIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Instituto Politécnico De Leiria Edificio Sede Rua General Norton de Matos Apartado 4133 2411-901 Leiria / PT | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERREIRA MIRANDA, Nuno Miguel Rua Imaculada Conceiçâo, Nº 87 410-338 Leira / PT | 02 /
MOREIRA MENDES, Luís Miguel Avenida Visconde do Amparo, Lote 14, 2ºDRT Marrazes 2415-474 Leira / PT | [2018/48] | Representative(s) | do Nascimento Gomes, Rui J. Pereira da Cruz, S.A. Rua Victor Cordon, 10-A 1249-103 Lisboa / PT | [2018/48] | Application number, filing date | 18171278.7 | 08.05.2018 | [2018/48] | Priority number, date | PT20170110087 | 22.05.2017 Original published format: PT 2017110087 | [2018/48] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3407487 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/22, H03F1/02 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
H03F1/223 (EP);
H03F1/0283 (EP);
H03F1/3205 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] |
Former [2018/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOHER LINEARITÄT SIGNALVERSTÄRKER | [2018/48] | English: | HIGH LINEARITY SIGNAL AMPLIFIER | [2018/48] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR DE SIGNAL DE HAUTE LINÉARITÉ | [2018/48] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 27.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/26] | 21.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.07.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.07.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.11.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5459434 (LIGER RENE [FR], et al) [A] 1-10* column 7, line 18 - line 47; figure 7 *; | [XI]US2014266469 (ISSAKOV VADIM [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,9 * paragraph [0030]; figure 3 * [I] 4,6,10; | [XI]WO2016099757 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,9 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0036]; figure 5 * [I] 3,4,6-8,10; | [XI]WO2016203525 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,9 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031]; figure 2 * [I] 3,4,6-8,10; | [XI] - SANCHEZ-RODRIGUEZ TRINIDAD ET AL, "A 1.2-V 450-[mu]W $G_{m}$ - $C$ Bluetooth Channel Filter Using a Novel Gain-Boosted Tunable Transconductor", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VERY LARGE SCALE INTEGRATION (VLSI) SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, vol. 23, no. 8, doi:10.1109/TVLSI.2014.2341929, ISSN 1063-8210, (20150801), pages 1572 - 1576, (20150722), XP011664077 [X] 1,2,5,9 * Section B. Transconductor Programmability;; figure 3 * [I] 3,4,6-8,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TVLSI.2014.2341929 |