EP3511283 - MOVING WALKWAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otis Elevator Company One Carrier Place Farmington, Connecticut 06032 / US | [2019/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thomas, Illedits Businesspark Marximum Modecenterstr. 17 Building 1 1110 Vienna / AT | 02 /
Alexander, Turek Businesspark Marximum Modecenterstr. 17 Building 1 1110 Vienna / AT | 03 /
Martin, Michalke Businesspark Marximum Modecenterstr. 17 Building 1 1110 Vienna / AT | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [2019/29] | Application number, filing date | 18171528.5 | 09.05.2018 | [2019/29] | Priority number, date | EP20180151576 | 15.01.2018 Original published format: EP 18151576 | [2019/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3511283 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B66B23/02, B66B23/10, B66B23/14 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
B66B23/024 (EP,US);
B66B21/10 (CN,US);
B66B23/02 (CN);
B66B23/026 (US);
B66B23/08 (US);
B66B23/10 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] |
Former [2019/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRSTEIG | [2019/29] | English: | MOVING WALKWAY | [2019/29] | French: | TROTTOIR ROULANT | [2019/29] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 15.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/17] | 23.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB510029 (WILLIAM SEBASTIAN GRAFF BAKER, et al) [Y] 1,2,8,9,11-14 * figures 1-4 * * page 2, line 85 - page 3, line 15 * [A] 3-7,10,15; | [YA]DE1530022 (RATHGEBER AG WAGGONFAB JOS) [Y] 1-6,9-12,14,15 * figures 1-5 * * pages 6-12 * [A] 7,8,13; | [Y]DE20100833U (THYSSEN FAHRTREPPEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-5,8-15 * abstract * * page 8 *; | [Y]US2012024675 (SPIELMAN FRED R [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-15* abstract * |