EP3406771 - WINDING SHAFT FOR A NONWOVEN FABRIC COILER, AND CORRESPONDING NONWOVEN FABRIC COILER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trützschler Group SE Duvenstrasse 82-92 41199 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2022/19] |
Former [2018/48] | For all designated states Trützschler GmbH & Co. KG Duvenstrasse 82-92 41199 Mönchengladbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barlog, Krzysztof Sterngasse 129 64347 Griesheim / DE | 02 /
Schütt, Philipp Würzburger Straße 14b 63517 Rodenbach / DE | [2018/48] | Application number, filing date | 18172593.8 | 16.05.2018 | [2018/48] | Priority number, date | DE201710111416 | 24.05.2017 Original published format: DE102017111416 | [2018/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3406771 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | D01G27/04, B65H19/22, B65H75/02, B65H18/06 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
D01G27/04 (EP);
D01G27/00 (CN);
B65H19/2261 (EP);
B65H75/10 (EP);
B65H2402/52 (EP);
B65H2701/177 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] |
Former [2018/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WICKELWELLE FÜR EINEN VLIESWICKLER UND DAFÜR VORGESEHENER VLIESWICKLER | [2018/48] | English: | WINDING SHAFT FOR A NONWOVEN FABRIC COILER, AND CORRESPONDING NONWOVEN FABRIC COILER | [2018/48] | French: | ARBRE DE BOBINAGE POUR UN BOBINEUR DE NON-TISSÉ ET BOBINEUR DE NON-TISSÉ CORRESPONDANT | [2018/48] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/48] | 05.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/47] | 22.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9817565 (VALMET KARLSTAD AB [SE]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 4 - page 1, line 32 * * page 8, line 11 - page 10, line 22; figures 14-17 * [I] 2-10; | [XI]US6047916 (OENNERLOEV LARS-ERIK [SE]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 12 - column 1, line 15 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 19; figure 1 *[I] 2-10; | [XI]WO0026131 (VALMET CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1,5-7 * page 1, line 3 - page 1, line 9 * * page 12, line 34 - page 15, line 9; figures 6, 8 * [I] 2-4,8-10; | [XI]WO2007096917 (CELLI NONWOVENS SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,8-15 * page 1, line 5 - page 1, line 20 * * page 6, line 8 - page 7, line 32; figures 1,1a, 2, 2a * [I] 5-7; | [XI]EP2030926 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0063]; figures 7, 8 * [I] 2-10 |