EP3406380 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CUTOFF MACHINING SINTERED MAGNETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INAMI, Hitoshi c/o Takefu Plant Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-5, Kitago 2-chome Echizen-shi, Fukui / JP | 02 /
UENO, Takafumi c/o Takefu Plant Shin-Etsu Magnet Co., Ltd. 1-5, Kitago 2-chome Echizen-shi, Fukui / JP | 03 /
AKADA, Kazuhito c/o Takefu Plant Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-5, Kitago 2-chome Echizen-shi, Fukui / JP | 04 /
KASASHIMA, Masaki c/o Takefu Plant Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-5, Kitago 2-chome Echizen-shi, Fukui / JP | [2020/52] |
Former [2018/48] | 01 /
INAMI, Hitoshi c/o Takefu Plant Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-5, Kitago 2-chome Echizen-shi, Fukui / JP | ||
02 /
UENO, Takafumi c/o Takefu Plant Shin-Etsu Magnet Co., Ltd. 1-5, Kitago 2-chome Echizen-shi, Fukui / JP | |||
03 /
AKADA, Kazuhito c/o Takefu Plant Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-5, Kitago 2-chome Echizen-shi, Fukui / JP | |||
04 /
KASASHIMA, Masaki c/o Takefu Plant Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-5, Kitago 2-chome Echizen-shi, Fukui / JP | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2020/52] |
Former [2018/48] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 18173038.3 | 17.05.2018 | [2018/48] | Priority number, date | JP20170104336 | 26.05.2017 Original published format: JP 2017104336 | [2018/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3406380 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3406380 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B23D47/04, B28D1/04, B28D7/04 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
B24B27/0675 (EP,US);
B24B41/005 (CN);
B23D47/047 (EP,US);
B24B27/06 (CN);
B24B41/06 (CN);
B24B47/20 (EP,US);
B24B55/02 (CN);
B28D1/04 (EP,US);
B28D1/24 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2020/51] |
Former [2019/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | ||
Former [2018/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SPANABHEBENDEN BEARBEITUNG VON GESINTERTEN MAGNETEN | [2018/48] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CUTOFF MACHINING SINTERED MAGNETS | [2018/48] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'USINAGE POUR LA COUPE D'AIMANTS FRITTÉS | [2020/11] |
Former [2018/48] | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'USINAGE POUR LA COUPE D'AIMANTS FRITTÉ | Examination procedure | 24.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 24.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]CH175598 (MEULI SCHMIDWEBER & CO [CH]) [Y] 1,3-5,9-12 * page 1, column r, line 22 - page 2, column l, line 24 * * claim . * * figure - * [A] 2,6,14; | [A]US3122043 (VICTOR SHANOK, et al) [A] 1,14 * figure 3 *; | [YA]US3797338 (MOLNAR M) [Y] 1,3-5,9-12 * column 1, lines 4-9 * * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 47 * * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 3 * * column 5, lines 23-34 * * column 6, lines 40-63 * * column 11, lines 33-38 * * figures 1,2,4,5,6 * [A] 2,7,13,14; | [A]NL7901893 (MATTIJSSEN BV MASCHF) [A] 1,14 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0515333 (ANDREUCCI FRANCO [IT], et al) [A] 1,14* figure 3 * | Examination | JP2001047363 | by applicant | JP2010110850 | JP2010110851 | JP2010110966 | JP2011156655 | JP2011156863 | US2011312255 | JP2012000708 |