EP3441698 - HYBRID TANDEM COMPRESSOR SYSTEM AND CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lennox Industries Inc. 2100 Lake Park Blvd. Richardson, TX 75080 / US | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERG, Eric 5609 Glenview lane The Colony, TX Texas 75056 / US | 02 /
IYENGAR, Ajay 1600 Metrocrest Dr Carrollton, TX 75006 / US | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Protector IP AS Pilestredet 33 0166 Oslo / NO | [2020/35] |
Former [2019/07] | Protector IP AS Oscarsgate 20 0352 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 18173841.0 | 23.05.2018 | [2019/07] | Priority number, date | US201715671243 | 08.08.2017 Original published format: US201715671243 | [2019/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3441698 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3441698 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F25B49/02 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
F25B49/022 (EP,US);
F24F11/83 (US);
F24F11/85 (US);
F24F2110/12 (US);
F24F2110/22 (US);
F25B2400/0751 (EP,US);
F25B2600/0251 (EP,US);
F25B2600/0253 (EP,US);
F25B2700/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] |
Former [2019/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HYBRIDTANDEMKOMPRESSORSYSTEM UND STEURERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/07] | English: | HYBRID TANDEM COMPRESSOR SYSTEM AND CONTROL METHOD | [2019/07] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMPRESSEUR TANDEM HYBRIDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2019/07] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 13.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.05.2018 | AL | 26.08.2020 | AT | 26.08.2020 | CY | 26.08.2020 | CZ | 26.08.2020 | DK | 26.08.2020 | EE | 26.08.2020 | ES | 26.08.2020 | FI | 26.08.2020 | HR | 26.08.2020 | IT | 26.08.2020 | LT | 26.08.2020 | LV | 26.08.2020 | MC | 26.08.2020 | MK | 26.08.2020 | MT | 26.08.2020 | NL | 26.08.2020 | PL | 26.08.2020 | RO | 26.08.2020 | RS | 26.08.2020 | SE | 26.08.2020 | SI | 26.08.2020 | SK | 26.08.2020 | SM | 26.08.2020 | BG | 26.11.2020 | NO | 26.11.2020 | GR | 27.11.2020 | IS | 26.12.2020 | PT | 28.12.2020 | IE | 23.05.2021 | LU | 23.05.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 23.05.2018 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
MK | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 23.05.2021 | ||
LU | 23.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 23.05.2018 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 23.05.2021 | ||
LU | 23.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 23.05.2021 | ||
LU | 23.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 23.05.2021 | ||
LU | 23.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 23.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 26.08.2020 | |
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 26.08.2020 | |
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 26.08.2020 | |
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1099918 (MAERSK CONTAINER IND AS [DK]) [A] 11* paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0109]; figures 1-5 *; | [XAI]US2005091998 (CHO EUN-JUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10,12-14 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0074]; figures 1-5 * [A] 11 [I] 6; | [XAI]US2006225445 (LIFSON ALEXANDER [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10,12-14 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-5 * [A] 11 [I] 6; | [A]WO2009061804 (CARRIER CORP [US], et al) [A] 11 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-4 * |