EP3415905 - VIBRATION INDUCED NOISE SUPPRESSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2018/51] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYE, Sheridon Everette 106 Highland Road Mansfield, CT 06250 / US | 02 /
LIU, Jun 23 Marshall St., Apt B6 Hartford, CT 06105 / US | [2021/26] |
Former [2018/51] | 01 /
HAYE, Sheridon Everette 106 Highland Road Mansfield, CT Connecticut 06250 / US | ||
02 /
LIU, Jun 23 Marshall St. Apt B6 Hartford, CT Connecticut 06105 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/14] |
Former [2018/51] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18174174.5 | 24.05.2018 | [2018/51] | Priority number, date | US201715604336 | 24.05.2017 Original published format: US201715604336 | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3415905 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3415905 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/28 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
G01N33/2835 (EP,US);
G01N27/025 (US);
F01D21/003 (US);
F01D25/18 (US);
G01N33/2858 (EP,US);
H01F27/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] |
Former [2018/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHWINGUNGSINDUZIERTE GERÄUSCHUNTERDRÜCKUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/51] | English: | VIBRATION INDUCED NOISE SUPPRESSION DEVICE | [2018/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUPPRESSION DE BRUIT INDUIT PAR VIBRATION | [2018/51] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 19.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.05.2018 | AL | 06.04.2022 | AT | 06.04.2022 | CY | 06.04.2022 | CZ | 06.04.2022 | DK | 06.04.2022 | EE | 06.04.2022 | ES | 06.04.2022 | FI | 06.04.2022 | HR | 06.04.2022 | IT | 06.04.2022 | LT | 06.04.2022 | LV | 06.04.2022 | MC | 06.04.2022 | MK | 06.04.2022 | MT | 06.04.2022 | NL | 06.04.2022 | PL | 06.04.2022 | RO | 06.04.2022 | RS | 06.04.2022 | SE | 06.04.2022 | SI | 06.04.2022 | SK | 06.04.2022 | SM | 06.04.2022 | TR | 06.04.2022 | IE | 24.05.2022 | LU | 24.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.07.2022 | GR | 07.07.2022 | IS | 06.08.2022 | PT | 08.08.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 24.05.2018 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
MK | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
TR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 24.05.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 24.05.2018 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
MK | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 24.05.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 24.05.2018 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 24.05.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 24.05.2018 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 24.05.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 24.05.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 24.05.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 24.05.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 24.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 06.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5444367 (KEMPSTER ROBERT W [CA], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 3,4,11,11A * * column 7, line 18 - line 63 *; | [X]WO2007088015 (HYDAC FILTERTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 11, line 6 - page 12, line 25 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP2028474 (BUSCH DIETER & CO PRUEFTECH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2009189599 (FUJII TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 1 *; | [A]CA2639710 (UNIV OTTAWA [CA]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2017138217 (SCHWARZ FREDERICK M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * figure 5 * |