EP3407278 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REPORTING LOSS OF CARD OR DEVICE ASSOCIATED WITH ACCOUNT NUMBER OR STOLEN OF ACCOUNT NUMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yang Room 01, Floor 9, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources, No. 68 Qinghe Middle Street Haidian District Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | [2018/48] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2018/48] | Application number, filing date | 18174383.2 | 25.05.2018 | [2018/48] | Priority number, date | CN201710381154 | 25.05.2017 Original published format: CN201710381154 | [2018/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3407278 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/10, G06Q20/40 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0185 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/354 (US);
G06Q20/409 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] |
Former [2018/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MELDUNG DES VERLUSTES DER KARTE ODER EINER EINRICHTUNG, DIE MIT EINER KONTONUMMER ODER EINER GESTOHLENEN KONTONUMMER VERBUNDEN IST | [2018/48] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REPORTING LOSS OF CARD OR DEVICE ASSOCIATED WITH ACCOUNT NUMBER OR STOLEN OF ACCOUNT NUMBER | [2018/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR SIGNALER LA PERTE D'UNE CARTE OU D'UN DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ À UN NUMÉRO DE COMPTE OU LE VOL D'UN NUMÉRO DE COMPTE | [2018/48] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 28.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003217001 (MCQUAIDE A C [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] ** paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0057] * |