EP3415875 - MAGNETIC-INDUCTIVE FLOW MEASURING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A MAGNETIC-INDUCTIVE FLOW MEASURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krohne Messtechnik GmbH Ludwig-Krohne-Strasse 5 47058 Duisburg / DE | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brockhaus, Helmut Revierstr. 6 46145 Oberhausen / DE | 02 /
Florin, Wilhelm Heideweg 21 47198 Duisburg / DE | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Huyssenallee 68 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2018/51] | Gesthuysen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 18174700.7 | 29.05.2018 | [2018/51] | Priority number, date | DE201710112950 | 13.06.2017 Original published format: DE102017112950 | [2018/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3415875 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3415875 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/58, G01F15/02, G01F15/18, G01R33/028, // H01H36/00, G01R33/07, G01P15/00 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
G01R33/0283 (EP,US);
G01F1/58 (EP,CN,US);
G01F1/588 (US);
G01D21/02 (US);
G01F1/86 (US);
G01F15/02 (EP,US);
G01F15/18 (EP,US);
G01F23/26 (US);
G01F25/10 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/51] | G01F1/58, G01F15/02, G01F15/18, // H01H36/00, G01R33/07, G01P15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] |
Former [2018/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MAGNETISCH-INDUKTIVES DURCHFLUSSMESSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES MAGNETISCH-INDUKTIVEN DURCHFLUSSMESSGERÄTS | [2018/51] | English: | MAGNETIC-INDUCTIVE FLOW MEASURING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A MAGNETIC-INDUCTIVE FLOW MEASURING DEVICE | [2018/51] | French: | DÉBITMÈTRE MAGNÉTO-INDUCTIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DÉBITMÈTRE MAGNÉTO-INDUCTIF | [2018/51] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 19.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.05.2018 | AL | 16.03.2022 | CY | 16.03.2022 | CZ | 16.03.2022 | DK | 16.03.2022 | EE | 16.03.2022 | FI | 16.03.2022 | HR | 16.03.2022 | LT | 16.03.2022 | LV | 16.03.2022 | MC | 16.03.2022 | MK | 16.03.2022 | PL | 16.03.2022 | RO | 16.03.2022 | RS | 16.03.2022 | SE | 16.03.2022 | SI | 16.03.2022 | SK | 16.03.2022 | SM | 16.03.2022 | IE | 29.05.2022 | LU | 29.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | BG | 16.06.2022 | NO | 16.06.2022 | GR | 17.06.2022 | IS | 16.07.2022 | PT | 18.07.2022 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 29.05.2018 | |
AL | 16.03.2022 | ||
CY | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
IE | 29.05.2022 | ||
LU | 29.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 29.05.2018 | |
AL | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
IE | 29.05.2022 | ||
LU | 29.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
IE | 29.05.2022 | ||
LU | 29.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
IE | 29.05.2022 | ||
LU | 29.05.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
LU | 29.05.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
LU | 29.05.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | CZ | 16.03.2022 | |
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | CZ | 16.03.2022 | |
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 16.03.2022 | |
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 16.03.2022 | |
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 16.03.2022 | |
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 16.03.2022 | |
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 16.03.2022 | |
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 16.03.2022 | |
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.03.2022 | |
NO | 16.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4159645 (CUSHING VINCENT J) [A] 5,13,14 * figures 2a-b * * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 12 *; | [X]US4236410 (APPEL EGGERT, et al) [X] 1,8,10 * figures 1-3A *; | [A]WO9618086 (HERSEY MEASUREMENT CO [US]) [A] 1-14* figures 3a-5b *; | [XI]DE19713751 (KROHNE MESSTECHNIK KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-12 * figure 1 * * page 2, line 49 - line 51 * * page 3, line 32 - line 50 * * claims 1,2,5 * [I] 5,9,13,14; | [XP]EP3208580 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SYSTEMS USA INC [US]) [XP] 1 * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0014] * |