EP3410315 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR USING TILED DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palantir Technologies Inc. 1200 17th Street, Floor 15 Denver, CO 80202 / US | [2022/48] |
Former [2018/49] | For all designated states Palantir Technologies Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue, Suite 300 Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilczynski, Peter Palantir Technologies Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue, Suite 300 Palo Alto, CA California 94301 / US | 02 /
Cervelli, Daniel Palantir Technologies Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue, Suite 300 Palo Alto, CA California 94301 / US | 03 /
Freiberg, Stephen Palantir Technologies Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue, Suite 300 Palo Alto, CA California 94301 / US | [2018/49] | Representative(s) | Dendorfer, Claus, et al Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Neuhauser Straße 47 80331 München / DE | [2018/49] | Application number, filing date | 18174764.3 | 29.05.2018 | [2018/49] | Priority number, date | US201762512640P | 30.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762512640 P | US201715666368 | 01.08.2017 Original published format: US201715666368 | [2018/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3410315 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3410315 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/29, G06F16/31 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
G06F16/29 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06F16/322 (EP,US);
G06F3/04842 (EP,US);
G06F3/04845 (EP);
G06Q30/0201 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2018/49] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] |
Former [2018/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON FLIESENARTIGEN DATEN | [2022/27] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR USING TILED DATA | [2018/49] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION DE DONNÉES TESSELÉES | [2022/27] |
Former [2018/49] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON UNTERTEILTEN DATEN | ||
Former [2018/49] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION DE DONNÉES EN MOSAÏQUE | Examination procedure | 05.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 05.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.03.2022 | 30.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 30.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22211533.9 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 06.01.2023 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.12.2022 | AT | 07.12.2022 | CZ | 07.12.2022 | DK | 07.12.2022 | EE | 07.12.2022 | ES | 07.12.2022 | FI | 07.12.2022 | HR | 07.12.2022 | IT | 07.12.2022 | LT | 07.12.2022 | LV | 07.12.2022 | MC | 07.12.2022 | NL | 07.12.2022 | PL | 07.12.2022 | RO | 07.12.2022 | RS | 07.12.2022 | SE | 07.12.2022 | SI | 07.12.2022 | SK | 07.12.2022 | SM | 07.12.2022 | NO | 07.03.2023 | GR | 08.03.2023 | IS | 07.04.2023 | PT | 10.04.2023 | IE | 29.05.2023 | LU | 29.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
IE | 29.05.2023 | ||
LU | 29.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
IE | 29.05.2023 | ||
LU | 29.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
LU | 29.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 07.12.2022 | |
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 07.12.2022 | |
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 07.12.2022 | |
NO | 07.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013328941 (CARBONNEAU GUILLAUME A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0125] * [I] 3-7,10-14; | [A]US2014333651 (CERVELLI DAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0090] ** paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0134] *; | [XI]US2015370828 (MAURER JENNIFER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0057] * [I] 3-7,10-14 | Examination | - STEFAN PODLIPNIG ET AL, "A survey of Web cache replacement strategies", ACM COMPUTING SURVEYS, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, US, (20031201), vol. 35, no. 4, doi:10.1145/954339.954341, ISSN 0360-0300, pages 374 - 398, XP058313260 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/954339.954341 |