EP3418341 - STRETCH RELEASE ADHESIVE, HOUSING ASSEMBLY AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2023/35] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | ||
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | ||
Former [2018/52] | For all designated states Guangdong OPPO Mobile Telecommunications Corp., Ltd. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENG, Yuanqing No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/35] |
Former [2018/52] | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 4 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18174769.2 | 29.05.2018 | [2018/52] | Priority number, date | CN201710466150 | 19.06.2017 Original published format: CN201710466150 | CN201720717989U | 19.06.2017 Original published format: CN 201720717989 U | [2018/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3418341 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3418341 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/38 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
C09J7/38 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (US);
C09J7/403 (US);
G06F1/1613 (US);
H04M1/026 (US);
H04W88/00 (US);
C09J2203/318 (EP,US);
C09J2203/326 (EP,US);
C09J2203/33 (EP,US);
C09J2301/122 (EP,US);
C09J2301/124 (EP,US);
C09J2301/204 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/52] | C09J7/38, H01M2/10, H04W88/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] |
Former [2018/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DURCH DEHNUNG LÖSBARER HAFTKLEBER, GEHÄUSEANORDNUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2018/52] | English: | STRETCH RELEASE ADHESIVE, HOUSING ASSEMBLY AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2018/52] | French: | ADHÉSIF LIBÉRABLE PAR ÉTIREMENT, ENSEMBLE BOÎTIER ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2018/52] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 31.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2014204803 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-5,7 * figures 1B, 3D, 5B * * claims 1, 10 * * page 5, line 21 - line 32 *; | [XYI]WO2014209622 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 2 * * page 5, line 36 - page 6, line 9 * * figures 2, 3, 4 * * page 5, line 22 - line 33 * [Y] 8-15 [I] 3,6; | [Y]CN105524570 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO) [Y] 8-15 * paragraph [0002] * * claims 12-15 *; | [P]WO2017127293 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [P] * page 1, line 6 - line 16 ** claims 12-15 * |