EP3566865 - STRATIFIED COMPOSITE MATERIAL WITH FOAM SUPPORTING LAYER AND PROCESS FOR OBTAINING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lorenzi S.r.l. Via Oslo, 2 35010 Vigonza (PD) / IT | [2019/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORENZI, Lorenzo LORENZI S.r.l. Via Oslo, 2 35010 VIGONZA / IT | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Morabito, Sara Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18 35122 Padova / IT | [2019/46] | Application number, filing date | 18175325.2 | 31.05.2018 | [2019/46] | Priority number, date | IT20180005307 | 11.05.2018 Original published format: IT201800005307 | [2019/46] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3566865 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/06, B32B5/18, B32B27/40, D06N3/14, B32B37/00 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
B32B5/18 (EP);
B32B27/065 (EP);
B32B27/40 (EP);
B32B37/025 (EP);
D06N3/009 (EP);
D06N3/14 (EP);
B32B2250/02 (EP);
B32B2266/0207 (EP);
B32B2266/0221 (EP);
B32B2266/025 (EP);
B32B2266/0278 (EP);
B32B2307/554 (EP);
B32B2307/738 (EP);
B32B2437/02 (EP);
B32B2479/00 (EP);
D06M17/00 (EP);
D06N2211/106 (EP);
D06N2211/14 (EP);
D06N2211/28 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESCHICHTETES VERBUNDMATERIAL MIT EINER SCHAUMTRÄGERSCHICHT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/46] | English: | STRATIFIED COMPOSITE MATERIAL WITH FOAM SUPPORTING LAYER AND PROCESS FOR OBTAINING IT | [2019/46] | French: | MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE STRATIFIÉ PRÉSENTANT UNE COUCHE SUPPORT EN MOUSSE ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'OBTENTION | [2019/46] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 29.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DD237191 (AKADEMIE DER WISSENSCHAFTEN DER DDR) [Y] 1-10 * page 1 - page 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0963285 (COMMER SPA [IT]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0026] - [0028] - [0032]; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP1582107 (BAUER NIKE HOCKEY INC [CA]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020]; figure 7 *; | [A]US2006258244 (SALZMANN OLIVER [DE], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0002] , [0034] , [0 48] - [0050] - [0066] , [0083] , [0085] *; | [A]EP2026959 (ROMANORE SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0035] - [0040] *; | [XYI]CN106113859 (JIANGSU GUOXIN COMPOSITE MAT TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,4-7,9 * the whole document * [Y] 1-10 [I] 2,3,8,10 |