EP3417948 - MOULDED PUMP FOR DISPENSING A FLUID PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Albéa Services ZAC des Barbanniers 1 avenue du Général de Gaulle "Le Signac" 92230 Gennevilliers / FR | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ezzina, Emir 2 rue des Océanides 78100 Montigny-le-Bretonneux / FR | 02 /
Rossignol, Eric 96 rue Morinet 71100 Chalon sur Saone / FR | [2021/31] |
Former [2018/52] | 01 /
EZZINA, Emir 2 rue des Océanides 78100 MONTIGNY-LE-BRETONNEUX / FR | ||
02 /
ROSSIGNOL, Eric 96 rue Morinet 71100 CHALON SUR SAONE / FR | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2021/31] |
Former [2018/52] | Gevers & Orès 41 avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 18175550.5 | 01.06.2018 | [2018/52] | Priority number, date | FR20170055731 | 22.06.2017 Original published format: FR 1755731 | [2018/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3417948 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3417948 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
B05B11/027 (EP,US);
B05B11/1033 (EP,CN,US);
B05B11/0027 (CN);
B05B11/1032 (EP,US);
B05B11/1035 (EP,US);
B05B11/1045 (CN);
B05B11/1052 (EP,US);
B05B11/1069 (EP,US);
B05B11/1097 (EP,US);
B05B11/1059 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] |
Former [2018/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GEGOSSENE PUMPE FÜR DIE VERTEILUNG EINES FLUIDPRODUKTS | [2018/52] | English: | MOULDED PUMP FOR DISPENSING A FLUID PRODUCT | [2018/52] | French: | POMPE MOULÉE POUR LA DISTRIBUTION D'UN PRODUIT FLUIDIQUE | [2018/52] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 18.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2018 | AL | 04.08.2021 | AT | 04.08.2021 | CY | 04.08.2021 | CZ | 04.08.2021 | DK | 04.08.2021 | EE | 04.08.2021 | ES | 04.08.2021 | FI | 04.08.2021 | HR | 04.08.2021 | IT | 04.08.2021 | LT | 04.08.2021 | LV | 04.08.2021 | MC | 04.08.2021 | MK | 04.08.2021 | MT | 04.08.2021 | NL | 04.08.2021 | PL | 04.08.2021 | RO | 04.08.2021 | RS | 04.08.2021 | SE | 04.08.2021 | SI | 04.08.2021 | SK | 04.08.2021 | SM | 04.08.2021 | TR | 04.08.2021 | BG | 04.11.2021 | NO | 04.11.2021 | GR | 05.11.2021 | IS | 04.12.2021 | PT | 06.12.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 01.06.2018 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
MK | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
TR | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 01.06.2018 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
MK | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 01.06.2018 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 01.06.2018 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3486663 (HUMPHREY FREDERICK HAROLD) [A] 1 * figures 4-6 *; | [A]US3753518 (KUTIK L) [A] 4,11 * column 2, line 11 - column 7, line 24; figures 3, 6, 7 *; | [A]US5271432 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS H [FR]) [A] 1* figures 4, 5 *; | [XA]WO2004080607 (INCRO LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,13-15 * page 20, line 15 - page 32, line 10; figures 5A, 5B, 6A, 6B, 8A-11B * [A] 4-12; | [X]US2006243825 (LAIDLER KEITH [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,13-15 * paragraph [0167] - paragraph [0192]; figures 8A, 8B, 10A-11B * |