EP3575758 - MONITORING UNIT FOR MONITORING A LINEAR ASSET AND METHOD FOR MONITORING A LINEAR ASSET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frauscher Sensortechnik GmbH Gewerbestraße 1 4774 St. Marienkirchen / AT | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosenberger, Martin Hackledt 45 4773 Eggerding / AT | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 18175568.7 | 01.06.2018 | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3575758 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01H9/00, G01S7/481, G01S7/497, B61L1/02, B61L25/02, G01S5/18, G01D5/353 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
G01H9/004 (EP);
G01D5/35358 (US);
B61L1/02 (EP);
B61L1/166 (EP);
B61L25/025 (EP);
G01S5/18 (EP);
G01S7/4818 (EP);
G01S7/497 (EP);
H04L67/12 (US);
G01S2205/01 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] |
Former [2019/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSEINHEIT ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINER LINEAREN ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINER LINEAREN ANLAGE | [2019/49] | English: | MONITORING UNIT FOR MONITORING A LINEAR ASSET AND METHOD FOR MONITORING A LINEAR ASSET | [2019/49] | French: | UNITÉ DE SURVEILLANCE PERMETTANT DE SURVEILLER UN ACTIF LINÉAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SURVEILLER UN ACTIF LINÉAIRE | [2019/49] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 09.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/35] | 22.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.04.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013114135 (OPTASENSE HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-13 * figures 1-3 * * page 1, lines 3-5 * * page 3, line 18 - page 5, line 30 * * page 13, line 19 - page 16, line 14 * * page 20, line 10 - page 21, line 22 *; | [X]WO2017093741 (OPTASENSE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10,12,13 * figures 1-3 * * page 1, line 24 - page 2, line 11 * * page 11, line 6 - page 15, line 32 ** page 17, lines 17-29 * | by applicant | EP20180157826 |