EP3579498 - METHOD FOR CONFIGURING A COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kintzler, Florian Hofjägerstraße 2 /2 /14 1140 Wien / AT | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/30] |
Former [2019/50] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18176265.9 | 06.06.2018 | [2019/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3579498 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3579498 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L41/0806, H04L41/0816, H04L41/0895, H04L41/40 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
H04L12/2809 (EP);
H04L41/0806 (EP);
H04L41/0816 (EP);
H04L41/0895 (EP);
H04L41/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/50] | H04L12/24, H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] |
Former [2019/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM KONFIGURIEREN EINES KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZES | [2019/50] | English: | METHOD FOR CONFIGURING A COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2019/50] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONFIGURATION D'UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION | [2022/46] |
Former [2019/50] | PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION D'UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION | Examination procedure | 19.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 04.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3185476 (SHORE TEL INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2,5,6 * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] *; | [XAI]WO2017186938 (SANCTUM NETWORKS LTD [IE]) [X] 1 * figures 1,6,7 * * page 15, line 28 - line 30 * * page 16, line 4 - line 8 * * page 26, line 10 - line 25 * * page 27, lines 1-5, 45 * * page 28, line 19 - line 27 * * page 32, line 20 - line 33 * * page 37, line 10 - page 38, line 16 * [A] 9 [I] 2-8,10; | [A]US2018109533 (THUBERT PASCAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 2, 3b,3c * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0048] ** paragraph [0052] * |