EP3416386 - HASH-BASED ENCODER DECISIONS FOR VIDEO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2018/51] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Bin c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R & D Headquarters 14F Building 2 No 5 Dan Ling Street Haidian District Beijing, 100080 / CN | 02 /
XU, Ji-Zheng c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R & D Headquarters 14F Building 2 No 5 Dan Ling Street Haidian District Beijing, 100080 / CN | [2020/46] |
Former [2018/51] | 01 /
LI, Bin c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R& D Headquarters 14F Building 2 No 5 Dan Ling Street Haidian District Beijing, 100080 / CN | ||
02 /
XU, Ji-Zheng c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R& D Headquarters 14F Building 2 No 5 Dan Ling Street Haidian District Beijing, 100080 / CN | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2018/51] | Application number, filing date | 18176304.6 | 30.09.2014 | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3416386 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3416386 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/503, H04N19/51, H04N19/14, H04N19/142, H04N19/176, H04N19/154 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
H04N19/176 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/14 (EP,RU,US);
H04N19/523 (KR);
H04N19/119 (KR);
H04N19/142 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/154 (KR,US);
H04N19/503 (EP,RU,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Title | German: | HASH-BASIERTE CODIERERENTSCHEIDUNGEN ZUR VIDEOCODIERUNG | [2018/51] | English: | HASH-BASED ENCODER DECISIONS FOR VIDEO CODING | [2018/51] | French: | DÉCISIONS DE CODEUR BASÉES SUR UN ALGORITHME DE HACHAGE POUR UN CODAGE VIDÉO | [2018/51] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 31.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14903205.4 / EP3202142 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2014 | AL | 13.01.2021 | AT | 13.01.2021 | CY | 13.01.2021 | CZ | 13.01.2021 | DK | 13.01.2021 | EE | 13.01.2021 | ES | 13.01.2021 | FI | 13.01.2021 | HR | 13.01.2021 | IT | 13.01.2021 | LT | 13.01.2021 | LV | 13.01.2021 | MC | 13.01.2021 | MK | 13.01.2021 | NL | 13.01.2021 | PL | 13.01.2021 | RO | 13.01.2021 | RS | 13.01.2021 | SE | 13.01.2021 | SI | 13.01.2021 | SK | 13.01.2021 | SM | 13.01.2021 | BG | 13.04.2021 | NO | 13.04.2021 | GR | 14.04.2021 | IS | 13.05.2021 | PT | 13.05.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | CH | 30.09.2021 | IE | 30.09.2021 | LI | 30.09.2021 | LU | 30.09.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 30.09.2014 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CY | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CY | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 |