EP3428720 - INTELLIGENT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OUTPUTTING A DEPTH IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nextvpu (Shanghai) Co., Ltd. Rm. 607, Section A Bld 1, No. 3000 Longdong Rd. Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feng, Xinpeng Rm 218, Blgd. 5, No. 3000 Longdong Rd Pudong New District Sanghai 201230 / CN | 02 /
Zhou, Ji Rm 218, Bldg. 5, No. 3000 Longdong Rd Pudong New District Shanghai 201230 / CN | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2019/03] | Application number, filing date | 18176460.6 | 07.06.2018 | [2019/03] | Priority number, date | CN201710577093 | 14.07.2017 Original published format: CN201710577093 | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3428720 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G03B35/10, H04N13/246, H04N13/271, H04N13/218 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
H04N13/271 (EP,US);
G06T7/514 (CN);
G03B35/08 (CN);
G03B35/10 (EP,US);
G06T7/557 (US);
H04N13/218 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSGABE EINES TIEFENBILDES | [2019/03] | English: | INTELLIGENT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OUTPUTTING A DEPTH IMAGE | [2019/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF INTELLIGENT ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE UNE IMAGE DE PROFONDEUR | [2019/03] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 16.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/33] | 17.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.10.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO0078055 (HENDRIKS EMILE [NL], et al) [X] 1-9,11-13 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 3 * * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 11 * * page 5, lines 6-7 * * page 7, lines 20-23 * * page 8, lines 4-10 * [Y] 14,15 [I] 10; | [XAY]US2015181089 (MIRLAY RAM SRIKANTH [IN]) [X] 1-9,11 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0014] * [A] 10,12,13[Y] 14,15 |