EP3579245 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR USE IN DETECTING MALINGERING BY A FIRST SUBJECT IN TESTS OF PHYSICAL AND/OR MENTAL FUNCTION OF THE FIRST SUBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILLIES, Murray Fulton c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SHARIFI SEDEH, Reza c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
VAN MINDE, Daisy c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 18176671.8 | 08.06.2018 | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3579245 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G16H50/20, G16H20/70 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
G16H50/20 (EP);
A61B5/16 (US);
A61B5/7275 (US);
A61B5/74 (US);
G16H20/70 (EP);
G16H50/30 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER DETEKTION VON SIMULATION DURCH EIN ERSTES SUBJEKT BEI TESTS DER KÖRPERLICHEN UND/ODER GEISTIGEN FUNKTION DES ERSTEN SUBJEKTES | [2019/50] | English: | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR USE IN DETECTING MALINGERING BY A FIRST SUBJECT IN TESTS OF PHYSICAL AND/OR MENTAL FUNCTION OF THE FIRST SUBJECT | [2019/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DESTINÉS À LA DETECTION DE LA SIMULATION PAR UN PREMIER SUJET DANS DES TESTS DE FONCTION PHYSIQUE ET/OU MENTALE DU PREMIER SUJET | [2019/50] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 03.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005273017 (GORDON EVIAN [AU]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0183] - paragraph [0199] * * paragraph [0328] - paragraph [0349] * * paragraph [0441] - paragraph [0448] *; | [I]US2015245789 (DROMERICK ALEXANDER [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0048] *; | [I]US2016022136 (ETTENHOFER MARK L [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0135] - paragraph [0139] * * paragraph [0181] - paragraph [0185] * * paragraph [0189] - paragraph [0191] *; | [I]US2016213298 (ELSMORE TIMOTHY F [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0024] ** paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0096] * |