EP3418231 - YARN WINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TMT Machinery, Inc. 6th Fl., Osaka Green Bldg., 2-6-26 Kitahama Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugiyama, Kenji c/o TMT Machinery, Inc., Kyoto Technical Center 136, Takeda Mukaishiro-cho Fushimi-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto, 612-8686 / JP | 02 /
Hashimoto, Kinzo c/o TMT Machinery, Inc., Kyoto Technical Center 136, Takeda Mukaishiro-cho Fushimi-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto, 612-8686 / JP | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/52] | Application number, filing date | 18176945.6 | 11.06.2018 | [2018/52] | Priority number, date | JP20170121462 | 21.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017121462 | [2018/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3418231 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3418231 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65H54/52, B65H54/72, B65H67/048 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
B65H54/52 (EP,CN);
B65H54/44 (CN);
B65H54/72 (EP);
B65H67/048 (EP);
B65H2701/31 (CN);
B65H2701/3132 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] |
Former [2018/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GARNWICKLER | [2018/52] | English: | YARN WINDER | [2018/52] | French: | ENROULEUR DE FILS | [2018/52] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 06.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2018 | AL | 26.08.2020 | AT | 26.08.2020 | CY | 26.08.2020 | CZ | 26.08.2020 | DK | 26.08.2020 | EE | 26.08.2020 | ES | 26.08.2020 | FI | 26.08.2020 | HR | 26.08.2020 | IT | 26.08.2020 | LT | 26.08.2020 | LV | 26.08.2020 | MC | 26.08.2020 | MK | 26.08.2020 | MT | 26.08.2020 | NL | 26.08.2020 | PL | 26.08.2020 | RO | 26.08.2020 | RS | 26.08.2020 | SE | 26.08.2020 | SI | 26.08.2020 | SK | 26.08.2020 | SM | 26.08.2020 | TR | 26.08.2020 | BG | 26.11.2020 | NO | 26.11.2020 | GR | 27.11.2020 | IS | 26.12.2020 | PT | 28.12.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 11.06.2018 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
MK | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
TR | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 11.06.2018 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
MK | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 11.06.2018 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 26.08.2020 | |
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 26.08.2020 | |
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5653395 (IWADE TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 8* figure 1 *; | [XA]DE10314293 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0006] , [0027] , [0035] , [0038]; figure - * [A] 2,4-10; | [XA]JP2008290821 (TMT MACHINERY INC) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0021] , [0035]; figure - * [A] 4-10 | by applicant | JP2003238031 | DE102006001041 | JP2012158436 |