EP3412637 - ULTRAVIOLET LIGHT WATER TREATMENT UNIT FOR CLOSED RECIRCULATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ebbtides Medical Inc. 13474 18 Avenue Surrey BC V4A 1W3 / CA | For all designated states Dominion Investments LLC 123 2nd Avenue P9 Salt Lake City UT 84103 / US | [2018/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TYMCHUK, Steven Denis 13474 18 Avenue Surrey, British Columbia V4A 1W3 / CA | 02 /
OLSEN, Richard 123 2nd Avenue P9 Salt Lake City, Utah 84103 / US | 03 /
HANSEN, Steve 16617 Cordillera Round Rock, Texas 78681 / US | [2018/50] | Representative(s) | Godlewski, Piotr JWP Rzecznicy Patentowi Dorota Rzazewska sp.k. Sienna Center Ul. Zelazna 28/30 00-833 Warszawa / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2018/50] | Godlewski, Piotr JWP Rzecznicy Patentowi Dorota Rzazewska sp.j. Sienna Center Ul. Zelazna 28/30 00-833 Warszawa / PL | Application number, filing date | 18177136.1 | 11.06.2018 | [2018/50] | Priority number, date | CA20172970494 | 09.06.2017 Original published format: CA 2970494 | [2018/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3412637 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/32 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
C02F1/325 (EP,US);
C02F2103/003 (EP,US);
C02F2103/023 (EP);
C02F2103/026 (EP);
C02F2201/3222 (US);
C02F2201/3223 (EP);
C02F2201/3228 (EP);
C02F2201/326 (EP);
C02F2209/006 (US);
C02F2209/008 (EP,US);
C02F2209/03 (US);
C02F2301/046 (EP,US);
C02F2303/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRAVIOLETTLICHTBEHANDLUNGSEINHEIT FÜR SYSTEME MIT HOHER DURCHFLUSSRATE | [2018/50] | English: | ULTRAVIOLET LIGHT WATER TREATMENT UNIT FOR CLOSED RECIRCULATION SYSTEMS | [2018/50] | French: | UNITÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE L'EAU PAR LUMIÈRE ULTRAVIOLETTE POUR DES SYSTÈMES À DÉBIT ÉLEVÉ | [2018/50] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/50] | 07.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/02] | 06.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US7175760 (CARY GEORGE S [US], et al) [I] 1-6 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 43 *[A] 7-15; | [XI]US2016213444 (KIREMITCI KIRKOR [CA]) [X] 1,4,5,15 * figures 5, 10, 11 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0 18] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0078] * * paragraphs [0081] - [0096] * * paragraph [0156] * * paragraphs [0159] - [0161] * * paragraphs [0193] - [0204] * * paragraph [0210] * [I] 2,3,6-14 | by applicant | US5843309 | US6909101 | US7604505 | US2011215037 | US2013146783 |