EP3453488 - BOARD TREATMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hundegger, Hans Kemptener Strasse 1 87749 Hawangen / DE | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstraße 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [2021/37] |
Former [2019/11] | Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstrasse 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18177660.0 | 14.06.2018 | [2019/11] | Priority number, date | DE201710120471 | 06.09.2017 Original published format: DE102017120471 | [2019/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3453488 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3453488 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q39/02, B27C9/04 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
B23Q39/026 (EP);
B27C9/04 (EP);
B27M1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] |
Former [2019/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PLATTENBEARBEITUNGSANLAGE | [2019/11] | English: | BOARD TREATMENT DEVICE | [2019/11] | French: | INSTALLATION D'USINAGE DE PLAQUES | [2019/11] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 13.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2018 | AL | 15.09.2021 | CY | 15.09.2021 | CZ | 15.09.2021 | DK | 15.09.2021 | EE | 15.09.2021 | ES | 15.09.2021 | FI | 15.09.2021 | HR | 15.09.2021 | LT | 15.09.2021 | LV | 15.09.2021 | MC | 15.09.2021 | MK | 15.09.2021 | NL | 15.09.2021 | PL | 15.09.2021 | RO | 15.09.2021 | RS | 15.09.2021 | SE | 15.09.2021 | SI | 15.09.2021 | SK | 15.09.2021 | SM | 15.09.2021 | BG | 15.12.2021 | NO | 15.12.2021 | GR | 16.12.2021 | IS | 15.01.2022 | PT | 17.01.2022 | GB | 14.06.2022 | IE | 14.06.2022 | LU | 14.06.2022 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 14.06.2018 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
GB | 14.06.2022 | ||
IE | 14.06.2022 | ||
LU | 14.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 14.06.2018 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
GB | 14.06.2022 | ||
IE | 14.06.2022 | ||
LU | 14.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
GB | 14.06.2022 | ||
IE | 14.06.2022 | ||
LU | 14.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 14.06.2022 | ||
LU | 14.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 14.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 15.09.2021 | |
NO | 15.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP1405693 (HUNDEGGER HANS [DE]) [I] 1,2,7-9 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0061] * [Y] 3-6; | [Y]EP2353820 (HUNDEGGER HANS [DE]) [Y] 3-6 * abstract * |