EP3582246 - CONTROL RELAY WITH AN OPERATING MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | [2021/11] |
Former [2019/51] | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRENK, Frank Friedensstr. 10 77756 Hausach / DE | 02 /
GRESS, Julian Erbsenlachen 3 78050 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | 03 /
MÜLLER, Peter Maria-Montessori-Str. 43 69221 Dossenheim / DE | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18177953.9 | 15.06.2018 | [2019/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3582246 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3582246 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01H47/02, H02H3/00 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
H01H47/02 (EP);
H01H2071/006 (EP);
H01H71/123 (EP);
H02H3/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] |
Former [2019/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STEUERRELAIS MIT EINEM BEDIENELEMENT | [2019/51] | English: | CONTROL RELAY WITH AN OPERATING MEMBER | [2019/51] | French: | RELAIS DE COMMANDE PRÉSENTANT UN ÉLÉMENT D'ACTIONNEMENT | [2019/51] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 09.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.06.2018 | AL | 17.03.2021 | AT | 17.03.2021 | CY | 17.03.2021 | CZ | 17.03.2021 | DK | 17.03.2021 | EE | 17.03.2021 | ES | 17.03.2021 | FI | 17.03.2021 | HR | 17.03.2021 | LT | 17.03.2021 | LV | 17.03.2021 | MC | 17.03.2021 | MK | 17.03.2021 | MT | 17.03.2021 | NL | 17.03.2021 | PL | 17.03.2021 | RO | 17.03.2021 | RS | 17.03.2021 | SE | 17.03.2021 | SI | 17.03.2021 | SK | 17.03.2021 | SM | 17.03.2021 | TR | 17.03.2021 | IE | 15.06.2021 | LU | 15.06.2021 | BG | 17.06.2021 | NO | 17.06.2021 | GR | 18.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | IS | 17.07.2021 | PT | 19.07.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 15.06.2018 | |
AL | 17.03.2021 | ||
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
MK | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
TR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IE | 15.06.2021 | ||
LU | 15.06.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 15.06.2018 | |
AL | 17.03.2021 | ||
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
MK | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
IE | 15.06.2021 | ||
LU | 15.06.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 15.06.2018 | |
AL | 17.03.2021 | ||
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
IE | 15.06.2021 | ||
LU | 15.06.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
IE | 15.06.2021 | ||
LU | 15.06.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
IE | 15.06.2021 | ||
LU | 15.06.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
IE | 15.06.2021 | ||
LU | 15.06.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
IE | 15.06.2021 | ||
LU | 15.06.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
LU | 15.06.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
NO | 17.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4351012 (ELMS ROBERT T, et al) [A] 1-4 * column 12, line 24 - column 13, line 12 ** figure 5 *; | [A]EP1710887 (MOELLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017] * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2015126553 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 16 * * figure 2 * |