EP3584172 - A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR GUIDING A PILOT OF AN APPROACHING AIRCRAFT TO A STOP POSITION AT A STAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADB Safegate Sweden AB Djurhagegatan 19 213 76 Malmö / SE | [2019/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berkmo, Anders c/o ADB Safegate Sweden AB Djurhagegatan 19 213 76 Malmö / SE | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/52] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 18178233.5 | 18.06.2018 | [2019/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3584172 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3584172 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B64F1/00, B64F1/18, G01S13/91, G08G5/02, G08G5/06, G08G5/00, G01S17/93 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
B64F1/002 (EP,KR,US);
B64F1/00 (RU);
G01S17/42 (EP,KR);
G01S17/88 (EP,KR);
G01S17/93 (RU);
G08G5/00 (RU);
G08G5/0026 (EP,KR,US);
G08G5/0082 (EP,KR);
G08G5/065 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR FÜHRUNG EINES PILOTEN EINES ANKOMMENDEN FLUGZEUGS ZU EINER STOPPPOSITION AN EINEM STANDPLATZ | [2019/52] | English: | A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR GUIDING A PILOT OF AN APPROACHING AIRCRAFT TO A STOP POSITION AT A STAND | [2019/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE GUIDER UN PILOTE DE L'APPROCHE D'UN AÉRONEF SUR UNE POSITION D'ARRÊT À UN STAND | [2019/52] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 28.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.06.2018 | AL | 07.10.2020 | CY | 07.10.2020 | EE | 07.10.2020 | HR | 07.10.2020 | LT | 07.10.2020 | LV | 07.10.2020 | MC | 07.10.2020 | MK | 07.10.2020 | RO | 07.10.2020 | RS | 07.10.2020 | SI | 07.10.2020 | SK | 07.10.2020 | SM | 07.10.2020 | BG | 07.01.2021 | IS | 07.02.2021 | LU | 18.06.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 18.06.2018 | |
AL | 07.10.2020 | ||
CY | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
LU | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CY | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
LU | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
LU | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
LU | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | EE | 07.10.2020 | |
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | HR | 07.10.2020 | |
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HR | 07.10.2020 | |
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HR | 07.10.2020 | |
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | HR | 07.10.2020 | |
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | LV | 07.10.2020 | |
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | LV | 07.10.2020 | |
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | RS | 07.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0135327 (SAFEGATE INT AB [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,12,13 * page 12, line 1 - page 15, line 5; figures 1-22 * * page 16, line 5 - page 16, line 9 * * page 24, line 8 - page 24, line 18 *; | [A]WO2004043785 (DEW ENGINEERING & DEVELOPMENT [CA], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-11 *; | [A]EP1927965 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1-11 *; | [X]US2008157947 (HUTTON NEIL [CA]) [X] 1-4,8,12,13 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-11 * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0058] *; | [A]US2016376026 (BAUDSON OLIVIER [FR], et al) [A] 1-13* figures 1-10 *; | [X]EP3222529 (ADB SAFEGATE SWEDEN AB [SE]) [X] 1,6,8-13 * paragraph [0038]; figures 1a-4 * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0064] * |