EP3421102 - SHOCK ABSORBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skylotec GmbH Im Mühlengrund 6-8 56566 Neuwied / DE | [2019/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hüttling, Daniel Weidaer Straße 35 75365 Calw / DE | 02 /
Huesmann, Heinz Fichtenäckerweg 9 72224 Ebhausen / DE | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/01] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 18178348.1 | 18.06.2018 | [2019/01] | Priority number, date | DE201720103795U | 26.06.2017 Original published format: DE 202017103795 U | [2019/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3421102 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A62B35/04, A62B35/00 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
A62B35/04 (EP);
A62B35/0025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] |
Former [2019/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BANDFALLDÄMPFER | [2019/01] | English: | SHOCK ABSORBER | [2019/01] | French: | AMORTISSEUR DE CHUTE À BANDE | [2019/01] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 11.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.10.2023 | 14.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/06] | 24.09.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/06] | 05.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0432535 (SPANSET INTER AG [CH]) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 39 - line 47; figure - *; | [A]DE202013103092U (SKYLOTEC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0012]; figure - *; | [XI]FR3030286 (ZEDEL [FR]) [X] 1,2,8-11 * page 11, line 10 - line 29; figure - * [I] 3-7 |