EP3415515 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF METHYL-{4,6-DIAMINO-2-[1-(2-FLUOROBENZYL)-1H-PYRAZOLO[3,4-B]PYRIDIN-3-YL]PYRIMIDIN-5-YL}METHYLCARBAMATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adverio Pharma GmbH Willy-Brandt-Platz 2 12529 Schönefeld / DE | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAIS, Franz-Josef Otto-Hahn-Str. 164 40591 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
REHSE, Joachim Am Kloster 12 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 03 /
JOENTGEN, Winfried Sprengelstrasse 1 50735 Köln / DE | 04 /
SIEGEL, Konrad Augsburger Strasse 11 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 18178602.1 | 22.11.2010 | [2018/51] | Priority number, date | EP20090177371 | 27.11.2009 Original published format: EP 09177371 | [2018/51] | Previously filed application, date | EP20140154762 | 22.11.2010 | [2018/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3415515 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3415515 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
A61P1/04 (EP);
C07D471/04 (EP,CN,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/437 (KR);
A61K31/506 (KR);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07C325/02 (IL,KR,US);
C07D239/48 (IL,KR,US);
C07D239/50 (IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Extension states | BA | 19.06.2018 | ME | 19.06.2018 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METHYL-{4,6-DIAMINO-2-[1-(2-FLUOROBENZYL)-1H-PYRAZOLO[3,4-B]PYRIDIN-3-YL]PYRIMIDIN-5-YL}METHYLCARBAMAT | [2018/51] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF METHYL-{4,6-DIAMINO-2-[1-(2-FLUOROBENZYL)-1H-PYRAZOLO[3,4-B]PYRIDIN-3-YL]PYRIMIDIN-5-YL}METHYLCARBAMATE | [2018/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MÉTHYL{4,6-DIAMINO-2-[1-(2-FLUOROBENZYL)-1H-PYRAZOLO [3,4-B]PYRIDIN-3-YL]PYRIMIDIN-5-YL}MÉTHYLCARBAMATE | [2018/51] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 01.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10781686.0 / EP2504334 | EP13151569.4 / EP2604608 | EP14154762.0 / EP2733142 | Divisional application(s) | EP19214991.2 / EP3699180 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 25.12.2019 | CY | 25.12.2019 | MC | 25.12.2019 | MK | 25.12.2019 | SM | 25.12.2019 | GR | 26.03.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CY | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | GR | 26.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO03095451 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1,2 * the whole document * * insbesondere Beispiele 8a, 5, 8 *; | [A]WO2005046725 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document ** Insbesondere Beipiele 8A, 1, 5 und 8 *; | [AP]WO2010079120 (BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AG [DE], et al) [AP] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [AD] - CHEMMEDCHEM, (200905), vol. 4, no. 5, doi:10.1002/CMDC.200900014, ISSN 1860-7179, pages 853 - 865, XP002622814 [AD] 1,2 * the whole document * * Insbesondere Schemata 10 und 11, Seiten 860, 863-864, Verbindungen 51, 52 und 20 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/CMDC.200900014 | [A] - SCHWOCH S ET AL, "2,3-DIHYDROSPIRO[1H-4- AND 5-AZABENZIMIDAZOLE-2.1'-CYCLOHEXANE] (= SPIRO[CYCLOHEXANE-1,2'(3'H)-1'H-IMIDAZO[4,5-B]PYRIDINE] AND SPIRO[CYCLOHEXANE-1,2'(3'H)-1'H-IMIDAZO[4,5-C]PYRIDINE]): REACTIONS WITH NUCLEOPHILES", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, VERLAG HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, BASEL, CH, (19940101), vol. 77, no. 8, doi:10.1002/HLCA.19940770811, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 2175 - 2190, XP002073789 [A] 1 * page 2182; figure 6 * * page 2189 - page 2190; compounds 39,40 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19940770811 | [A] - BARRACLOUGH P ET AL, "Mono-arylation of 2,3- and 3,4-diaminopyridine and 4,5-diaminopyrimidine, and syntheses of putative inotrope/beta-adrenoceptor antagonists", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL RESEARCH, SCIENCE REVIEWS LTD, GB, (19960101), vol. 9, no. 9, ISSN 0308-2342, pages 2316 - 2335, XP002103810 [A] 1 * page 407; figures 3,4 * |