EP3432684 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A CLEANING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.G.O. Elektro-Gerätebau GmbH Blanc-und-Fischer-Platz 1-3 75038 Oberderdingen / DE | [2022/36] |
Former [2019/04] | For all designated states E.G.O. Elektro-Gerätebau GmbH Rote-Tor-Strasse 14 75038 Oberderdingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egenter, Christian Max-Reger-Str. 14 75015 Bretten / DE | 02 /
Fuchs, Etienne Schönbornstraße 2 68789 St. Leon-Rot / DE | 03 /
Lomp, Stephane Friedenstr. 12/1 75038 Oberderdingen / DE | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/04] | Application number, filing date | 18179202.9 | 22.06.2018 | [2019/04] | Priority number, date | DE201710212216 | 17.07.2017 Original published format: DE102017212216 | [2019/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3432684 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3432684 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/06 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
H05B6/065 (EP);
H05B2213/03 (EP);
H05B2213/05 (EP);
Y02B40/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] |
Former [2019/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES KOCHFELDES | [2019/04] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A CLEANING DEVICE | [2019/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE PLAQUE DE CUISSON | [2019/04] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 23.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.09.2022 | CZ | 14.09.2022 | DK | 14.09.2022 | EE | 14.09.2022 | FI | 14.09.2022 | HR | 14.09.2022 | LT | 14.09.2022 | LV | 14.09.2022 | MC | 14.09.2022 | NL | 14.09.2022 | RO | 14.09.2022 | RS | 14.09.2022 | SE | 14.09.2022 | SI | 14.09.2022 | SK | 14.09.2022 | SM | 14.09.2022 | NO | 14.12.2022 | GR | 15.12.2022 | IS | 14.01.2023 | PT | 16.01.2023 | [2024/09] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | CZ | 14.09.2022 | |
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 14.09.2022 | |
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 14.09.2022 | |
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2068598 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044]; figure 4 *; | [A]EP2242328 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0022]; figures 3-5 ** paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032] *; | [A]WO2010118943 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 10, line 1 - line 15; figures 4,5 *; | [Y]EP2389045 (FAGORBRANDT SAS [FR]) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0055]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2506668 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0108]; figures 10A,11 *; | [XDY]EP2509392 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [XD] 1,5 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0068]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0074]; figure 6 * [Y] 2; | [XY]DE102014110026 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055]; figure 2 * [Y] 2; | [XY]EP3021639 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045]; figures 2,3 * [Y] 2 |