EP3586701 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR EXTRACTING JUICE FROM FOOD INGREDIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2020/01] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OBERSTEINER, Heimo c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
OTTI, Thomas c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 18179507.1 | 25.06.2018 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3586701 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/07, A47J19/02 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
A47J43/0716 (EP,US);
A47J19/027 (EP,US);
A47J36/20 (EP,US);
A47J43/046 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR EXTRAKTION VON SAFT AUS LEBENSMITTELZUTATEN | [2020/01] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR EXTRACTING JUICE FROM FOOD INGREDIENTS | [2020/01] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'EXTRACTION DE JUS À PARTIR D'INGRÉDIENTS ALIMENTAIRES | [2020/01] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/50] | 22.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5690021 (GREY RONALD [US]) [A] 1-15* column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 25; figure - *; | [A]WO9959454 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 10 - page 9, line 1; figure - *; | [A]US2004194643 (TIKARE PRINCE [GB]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0074]; figure - *; | [A]US6817750 (SANDS LENNY [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 39 - column 4, line 57; figure - *; | [A]FR2859617 (HAMEUR SA [LU]) [A] 1-15 * pages 3-10; figure - *; | [A]FR2923697 (SEB SA [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 27 - page 7, line 29; figure - * |