EP3588599 - COMPOSITION, ORGANIC-ELECTROLUMINESCENCE-DEVICE MATERIAL, COMPOSITION FILM, ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENCE DEVICE, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolleb, Heinz Steinenbühlstr. 173 4232 Fehren / CH | 02 /
Kawamura, Masahiro Hochbergerstrasse 76 4057 Basel / CH | 03 /
Iwabuchi, Hiruyuki 1280 Kami-izumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba, 299-0293 / JP | 04 /
Masuda, Tetsuya 1280 Kami-izumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba, 299-0293 / JP | 05 /
Chebotareva, Natalia 33, rue du Gehren 68220 Hagenthal le Bas / FR | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Hollah, Dorothee Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 18179974.3 | 26.06.2018 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3588599 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/50 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
H10K85/654 (EP);
H10K85/6572 (EP);
H10K2101/10 (EP);
H10K50/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, ORGANISCHES ELEKTROLUMINESZENZVORRICHTUNGSMATERIAL, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGSFILM, ORGANISCHE ELEKTROLUMINESZENZVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2020/01] | English: | COMPOSITION, ORGANIC-ELECTROLUMINESCENCE-DEVICE MATERIAL, COMPOSITION FILM, ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENCE DEVICE, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2020/01] | French: | COMPOSITION, MATÉRIAU DE DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE, FILM DE COMPOSITION, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2020/01] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/50] | 22.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013133224 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-14 * page 74; examples 1,8-14; claims 1-7 * * page 69 *; | [A]US2016087217 (ITO NAOYUKI [KR], et al) [A] 1-14* claims 1-20; compounds H-1b, H-3b *; | [A]KR20160111778 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-15; table 2; compounds 2-7,2-21,2-45,2-58 * | by applicant | EP1972619 | WO2011132683 | WO2013187896 | US2014070204 | US2015207079 | US2015228912 | KR20150141047 | KR20160086736 | KR20160111351 | US2016351822 | US2017117488 |