EP3588634 - IMPROVED ORGANIC ELECTRODE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InnovationLab GmbH Speyerer Strasse 4 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2023/01] |
Former [2020/01] | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wild, Andreas Johannesstrasse 61 45721 Haltern am See / DE | 02 /
Bakumov, Vadym Lipper Weg 193 45772 Marl / DE | 03 /
Korell, Michael Hunsrückstrasse 28 44805 Bochum / DE | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Sonnenberg Harrison Partnerschaft mbB, et al Herzogspitalstraße 10a 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/47] | Harrison, Robert John, et al Sonnenberg Harrison Partnerschaft mbB Herzogspitalstraße 10a 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2020/01] | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | Application number, filing date | 18180017.8 | 27.06.2018 | [2020/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3588634 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3588634 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/60, H01M4/137, H01M4/1399, H01M10/0569 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
H01M4/137 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/608 (US);
H01M10/0568 (US);
H01M10/0569 (EP,US);
H01M4/1399 (EP,KR);
H01M4/604 (EP,KR);
H01M4/62 (KR);
H01M4/624 (US);
H01M10/052 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] |
Former [2020/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES ORGANISCHES ELEKTRODENMATERIAL | [2020/01] | English: | IMPROVED ORGANIC ELECTRODE MATERIAL | [2020/01] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'ÉLECTRODE ORGANIQUE AMÉLIORÉ | [2020/01] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 06.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 22.11.2023 | DK | 22.11.2023 | EE | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | IT | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | NL | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SE | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | PT | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 22.11.2023 | |
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2017191481 (CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENT (CNRS) [FR], et al); | by applicant | US4898915 | WO2004016631 | WO2006134015 | EP1752474 | US2008251759 | JP2011074316 | JP2011074317 | US2011247494 | WO2015003725 | WO2015032951 | CN104530424 | CN104530426 | WO2015132374 | WO2015144798 | US9276292 | US9397341 | US9520598 | EP3136410 | EP3135704 | WO2017032583 | WO2017032582 | US2017077518 | US2017077517 | US2017104214 | US2017222232 | CN107118332 | WO2017207325 | WO2017220965 | EP3279223 | WO2018024901 | WO2018060680 |