EP3588026 - OPTICAL SYSTEM FOR THE SPECTRAL COMPONENT ANALYSIS OF NON-SOLID MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spiden AG Schindellegistrasse 3 8808 Pfäffikon SZ / CH | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASFANDIYAROV, Ruslan Alfred Escher-Straße 27 8002 Zürich / CH | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Sutter, Kurt E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 18180681.1 | 29.06.2018 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3588026 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/02, G01J3/10, G01J3/28, G01J3/42, G01J3/44, G01N21/47, G01N21/64 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
G01J3/42 (EP,US);
G01J3/0291 (EP,US);
G01J3/10 (EP,US);
G01J3/2803 (EP,US);
G01J3/44 (EP,US);
G01N21/31 (EP,US);
G01N21/64 (US);
G01N21/65 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6421 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES SYSTEM ZUR SPEKTRALEN KOMPONENTENANALYSE VON NICHT-FESTEN MEDIEN | [2020/01] | English: | OPTICAL SYSTEM FOR THE SPECTRAL COMPONENT ANALYSIS OF NON-SOLID MEDIA | [2020/01] | French: | SYSTÈME OPTIQUE POUR L'ANALYSE DE COMPOSANTES SPECTRALES DE MILIEUX NON SOLIDES | [2020/01] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/51] | 27.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6122042 (WUNDERMAN IRWIN [US], et al) [Y] 14 * figures 4B, 5 ** column 7, line 11 - line 41 *; | [XYI]US7046347 (AMEND JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-13 * figures 4-6 * * column 1, line 11 - line 13 * * column 3, line 28 - line 31 * * column 3, line 7 - line 27 * * column 2, line 3 - line 14 * * column 4, line 49 - line 67 * * column 3, line 41 - line 47 * [Y] 14 [I] 4,9,15 |