EP3514025 - CONNECTOR FOR QUICK CONNECTING OF FLUID LINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.E.P. d.o.o. Stari trg 2a 8230 Mokronog / SI | [2019/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASTELEC, Luka Plemberk 4 8322 Stopice / SI | 02 /
MARINC, Danilo Sentpeter 33 8222 Otocec / SI | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/30] | Application number, filing date | 18181570.5 | 04.07.2018 | [2019/30] | Priority number, date | SI20180000009 | 18.01.2018 Original published format: SI 201800009 | [2019/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3514025 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/48, F16L21/03 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
B60S1/48 (EP,US);
F16L21/03 (EP);
F16L37/0885 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDER ZUM SCHNELLEN VERBINDEN VON FLÜSSIGKEITSLEITUNGEN | [2019/30] | English: | CONNECTOR FOR QUICK CONNECTING OF FLUID LINES | [2019/30] | French: | CONNECTEUR POUR CONNEXION RAPIDE DE CONDUITES DE FLUIDE | [2019/30] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 14.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2007019916 (RAYMOND A & CIE [FR], et al) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 16 - page 5, line 18; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2146641 (MCWANE ARTHUR T) [Y] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2005106312 (RAYMOND A & CIE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP2988048 (SANOH IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 9a,9b * | by applicant | EP1915561 | EP1740876 |