EP3424580 - DEVICE FOR COLLECTION OF PARTICLES EMITTED INTO THE AIR BY A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Plastic Omnium 19 Boulevard Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/02] | For all designated states Compagnie Plastic Omnium 19 boulevard Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAGES, Yann 10 Chemin de la Rivoire 01800 SAINT-MAURICE-DE-GOURDANS / FR | 02 /
GILOTTE, Philippe Onglas 01470 BENONCES / FR | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | LLR 2, rue Jean Lantier 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/02] | LLR 11, boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 18181581.2 | 04.07.2018 | [2019/02] | Priority number, date | FR20170056294 | 04.07.2017 Original published format: FR 1756294 | [2019/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3424580 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01D45/12, B01D45/16, F16D65/00 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
B01D45/12 (EP);
B60H3/00 (CN);
B01D45/16 (EP);
B60H3/0608 (CN);
F16D65/0031 (EP);
B01D2259/4558 (EP);
B01D2279/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] |
Former [2019/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | 08.07.2019 | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFNAHME VON TEILCHEN, DIE VON EINEM FAHRZEUG IN DIE LUFT ABGEGEBEN WERDEN | [2019/02] | English: | DEVICE FOR COLLECTION OF PARTICLES EMITTED INTO THE AIR BY A VEHICLE | [2019/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CAPTATION DE PARTICULES ÉMISES DANS L'AIR PAR UN VÉHICULE | [2019/02] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 08.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4484937 (JAMES GRANVILLE C [GB], et al) [A] 1-17* figure 1 *; | [A]US5509853 (WELLS DEL [US]) [A] 1-17 * figure 6 *; | [X]US2007056254 (RELYEA WILLIAM S [US]) [X] 1-17 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP1837066 (SAVIANE TERZO [IT]) [X] 1-17 * figure 6 * |